EP3565814 - PROCESS AND CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF LUMACAFTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laurus Labs Limited DS-1 IKP knowledge park Genome Valley Turkapally Shameerpet Mandal, Ranga Reddy District Hyderabad 500078 / IN | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLLU, Ravindra Babu Laurus Labs Ltd DS-1 IKP Knowledge Park Genome Valley, Turkapally, Shameerpet Mandal, Ranga Reddy District Hyderabad 500078 / IN | 02 /
DALASINGH, Prasanta Kumar Laurus Labs Ltd DS-1 IKP Knowledge Park Genome Valley, Turkapally, Shameerpet Mandal, Ranga Reddy District Hyderabad 500078 / IN | 03 /
DWARAMPUDI, Sushmita Laurus Labs Ltd DS-1 IKP Knowledge Park Genome Valley, Turkapally, Shameerpet Mandal, Ranga Reddy District Hyderabad 500078 / IN | 04 /
ANNEM, Chandrahasa Reddy Laurus Labs Ltd DS-1 IKP Knowledge Park Genome Valley, Turkapally, Shameerpet Mandal, Ranga Reddy District Hyderabad 500078 / IN | 05 /
VASIREDDI, Uma Maheswer Rao Laurus Labs Ltd DS-1 IKP Knowledge Park Genome Valley, Turkapally, Shameerpet Mandal, Ranga Reddy District Hyderabad 500078 / IN | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2024/28] |
Former [2019/46] | Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18736629.9 | 06.01.2018 | [2019/46] | WO2018IB50095 | Priority number, date | IN201741000812 | 09.01.2017 Original published format: IN201741000812 | [2019/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018127846 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3565814 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3565814 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, A61K31/443, A61P11/00 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/443 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
C07B2200/13 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/46] | C07D405/00, A61K31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KRISTALLINE FORMEN VON LUMACAFTOR | [2019/46] | English: | PROCESS AND CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF LUMACAFTOR | [2019/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET FORMES CRISTALLINES DE LUMACAFTOR | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 10.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24187487.4 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDP]WO2017017696 (MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD [IN]); | [XDP]WO2017056031 (GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [IN]) | International search | [YA]WO2007056341 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al); | [YA]WO2009073757 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al); | [YA]WO2011127290 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) | by applicant | IN201641000118 | IN201621004780 | IN5209CHE2015 | WO2007056341 | CN106432209 | WO2007IB56341 | WO2009IB73757 | WO2017IB17696 | WO2017IB25045 | WO2017IB56031 |