EP3553961 - PRECODING MATRIX INDICATING METHOD, PRECODING MATRIX DETERMINING METHOD, RECEIVE-END DEVICE, AND TRANSMIT-END DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Huangping Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
BI, Xiaoyan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
SHANG, Peng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/35] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18736630.7 | 04.01.2018 | [2019/35] | WO2018CN71463 | Priority number, date | CN20171007897 | 05.01.2017 Original published format: CN201710007897 | [2019/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018127110 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3553961 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0456, H04B7/06 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
H04B7/0478 (EP,US);
H04B7/0413 (CN);
H04B7/0456 (CN);
H04L25/0391 (US);
H04B7/0619 (EP);
H04B7/0695 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/35] | H04B7/0413, H04B7/0456 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE EINER VORCODIERUNGSMATRIX, VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER VORCODIERUNGSMATRIX, EMPFANGSSEITIGE VORRICHTUNG UND SENDESEITIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/35] | English: | PRECODING MATRIX INDICATING METHOD, PRECODING MATRIX DETERMINING METHOD, RECEIVE-END DEVICE, AND TRANSMIT-END DEVICE | [2019/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INDICATION DE MATRICE DE PRÉCODAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE MATRICE DE PRÉCODAGE, DISPOSITIF D'EXTRÉMITÉ DE RÉCEPTION, ET DISPOSITIF D'EXTRÉMITÉ DE TRANSMISSION | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2019 | Translation filed | 24.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 09.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN103780332 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [A] 1-12; | [A]CN103780331 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [A] 1-12; | [A]CN103795450 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [A] 1-12; | [A]US2014177683 (KRISHNAMURTHY SANDEEP H [US], et al)[A] 1-12; | [A]CN106160926 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-12 | by applicant | CN20171007897 |