EP3639599 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AN ENHANCED SCHEDULING REQUEST FOR 5G NR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | For all designated states FG INNOVATION COMPANY LIMITED Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road, Tuen Mun New Territories, Hong Kong SAR / HK | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states FG INNOVATION COMPANY LIMITED Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road, Tuen Mun New Territories, HK / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAHEEN, Kamel, M. c/o Sharp Laboratories of America, Inc. 17200 SE Mill Plain Boulevard Suite 200 Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | 02 /
AIBA, Tatsushi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 18737113.3 | 13.06.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018US37404 | Priority number, date | US201762520515P | 15.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762520515 P | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018232034 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3639599 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
H04W72/23 (EP);
H04W72/21 (EP);
H04W72/569 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR VERBESSERTE PLANUNGSANFRAGE FÜR 5G NR | [2020/17] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AN ENHANCED SCHEDULING REQUEST FOR 5G NR | [2020/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR UNE DEMANDE DE PLANIFICATION AMÉLIORÉE POUR NR 5G | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 19.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2675081 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0014] - [0022] - [0 57] - [0062] * * figures 2, 3 *; | [X] - HUAWEI ET AL, "SR triggering and cancellation", vol. RAN WG2, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1705198 SR TRIGGERING AND CANCELLATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170514), XP051275674 [X] 1-4 * chapters 2.1 and 3 * | [A] - SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS R&D INSTITUTE UK, "General considerations on numerology-specific Scheduling Request design options in NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1704572 GENERAL CONSIDERATIONS ON NUMEROLOGY-SPECIFIC SCHEDULING REQUEST DESIGN OPTIONS IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIO, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170514), XP051275127 [A] 1-4 * chapter 3 * | [A] - INTERDIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, "Logical Channel Prioritization for NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Spokane, USA; 20170403 - 20170407, (20170403), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1702871 (R15 NR WI AI10315 MAC LCP MULTIPLEXING), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170403), XP051244851 [A] 1-4 * chapter 2 * |