EP3649654 - ANALYSIS APPARATUS FOR DETECTING FISSION PRODUCTS BY MEASURING RADIOACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Framatome GmbH Paul-Gossen-Straße 100 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGENBERGER, Jan Lettenfeld 22 91090 Effeltrich / DE | 02 /
HUMMEL, Wolfgang Bayernstrasse 9 92318 Neumarkt / DE | 03 /
ALBRECHT, Thomas Alte Rentstr. 25 90765 Fürth / DE | 04 /
ZIMMERMANN, Christoph Meisenweg 12 91096 Möhrendorf / DE | 05 /
MICHALSKY, Marc Hauptstrasse 80 02791 Oderwitz / DE | 06 /
ZEH, Peter Kalchreuther-Strasse 16 90542 Eckental / DE | 07 /
BURCHARDT, Carsten Am Kindergarten 10 55270 Schwabenheim / DE | [2020/21] |
Former [2020/20] | 01 /
LANGENBERGER, Jan Dr. Rühl Strasse 9 91090 Effeltrich / DE | ||
02 /
HUMMEL, Wolfgang Bayernstrasse 9 92318 Neumarkt / DE | |||
03 /
ALBRECHT, Thomas Alte Rentstrasse 205 90765 Fürth / DE | |||
04 /
ZIMMERMANN, Christoph Meisenweg 12 91096 Möhrendorf / DE | |||
05 /
MICHALSKY, Marc Hauptstrasse 80 02791 Oderwitz / DE | |||
06 /
ZEH, Peter Kalchreuther-Strasse 16 90542 Eckental / DE | |||
07 /
BURCHARDT, Carsten Nürnberger Strasse 59 91052 Erlangen / DE | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2022/07] |
Former [2020/20] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18737161.2 | 14.06.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018EP65899 | Priority number, date | DE201710114835 | 04.07.2017 Original published format: DE102017114835 | [2020/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019007661 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3649654 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3649654 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G21C17/00, G21C17/07 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
G21C17/002 (EP,KR,US);
G21C17/07 (EP,KR,US);
G01M3/224 (US);
G01T1/003 (US);
G21C11/00 (US);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG ZUM NACHWEIS VON SPALTPRODUKTEN DURCH MESSUNG EINER RADIOAKTIVITÄT | [2020/20] | English: | ANALYSIS APPARATUS FOR DETECTING FISSION PRODUCTS BY MEASURING RADIOACTIVITY | [2020/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER DES PRODUITS DE FISSION PAR MESURE DE RADIOACTIVITÉ | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 17.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2018 | AL | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | DK | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | HR | 16.02.2022 | IT | 16.02.2022 | LT | 16.02.2022 | LV | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | MK | 16.02.2022 | MT | 16.02.2022 | NL | 16.02.2022 | PL | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SI | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | TR | 16.02.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | NO | 16.05.2022 | GR | 17.05.2022 | IE | 14.06.2022 | LU | 14.06.2022 | PT | 16.06.2022 | IS | 17.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 14.06.2018 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
MK | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
TR | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 14.06.2018 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
MK | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
MK | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IE | 14.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | DK | 16.02.2022 | |
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | HR | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NO | 16.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS54153995 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XI]US4696788 (SELI MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,7-11,13 * abstract * * siehe Abb. 1 - 3 und deren Beschreibung * [I] 4,6,12,14,15 |