EP3641681 - SURGICAL ASSEMBLY, SYSTEM AND ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alesi Surgical Limited Suite 18 Cardiff Medicentre Heath Park Cardiff CF14 4UJ / GB | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEARN, George c/o Alesi Surgical Ltd Cardiff Medicentre Heath Park Cardiff CF14 4UJ / GB | 02 /
GRIFFITHS, Dominic Chapel View Barn Clawdd Coch Cowbridge Vale of Glamorgan CF71 7UP / GB | 03 /
AMOAH, Francis Kweku Egyin c/o Alesi Surgical Limited Cardiff Medicentre Heath Park Cardiff CF14 4UJ / GB | 04 /
BREWER, Jason Cardiff Medicentre Heath Park Cardiff South Glamorgan CF14 4UJ / GB | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Wynne-Jones IP Limited Office 16A The Maltings East Tyndall Street Cardiff, CF24 5EZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Wynne-Jones IP Limited Office 16A The Maltings East Tyndall Street Cardiff, CF24 5EA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18737368.3 | 20.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018GB51725 | Priority number, date | GB20170009835 | 20.06.2017 Original published format: GB 201709835 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018234803 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3641681 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/00, A61B18/14, A61B18/08, A61B18/12, A61B90/00 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
A61B18/00 (EP,GB);
A61B18/1206 (US);
A61B17/320068 (US);
A61B18/14 (EP,RU,US);
B03C3/02 (RU);
B03C3/41 (GB,RU);
B03C3/68 (GB,RU);
A61B18/08 (EP);
A61B2018/00077 (US);
A61B2018/00083 (US);
A61B2018/00577 (GB);
A61B2018/00595 (GB,US);
A61B2018/00601 (GB,US);
A61B2018/00625 (GB);
A61B2018/00654 (GB,US);
A61B2018/00708 (GB);
A61B2018/00827 (EP);
A61B2018/1266 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE ANORDNUNG, SYSTEM UND ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG | [2020/18] | English: | SURGICAL ASSEMBLY, SYSTEM AND ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY | [2020/18] | French: | ENSEMBLE CHIRURGICAL, SYSTÈME ET ENSEMBLE ÉLECTRODE | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 25.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006017754 (VNUS MED TECH INC [US], et al); | [XIA]WO2016024130 (ALESI SURGICAL LTD [GB]); | [A]US2017086915 (BATCHELOR KESTER J [US], et al) | International search | [A]WO2006017754 (VNUS MED TECH INC [US], et al); | [XAI]WO2016024130 (ALESI SURGICAL LTD [GB]); | [A]US2017086915 (BATCHELOR KESTER J [US], et al) |