EP3643097 - CONTROLLING ACCESS TO DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scentrics Information Security Technologies Ltd 238 Station Road Addlestone Surrey KT15 2PS / GB | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAWE-TAYLOR, John Stewart c/o Scentrics Information Security Technologies Ltd 238 Station Road Addlestone Surrey KT15 2PS / GB | 02 /
CHANDRASEKARAN, Guru Paran c/o Scentrics Information Security Technologies Ltd 238 Station Road Addlestone Surrey KT15 2PS / GB | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18737376.6 | 21.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018GB51735 | Priority number, date | GB20170010013 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: GB 201710013 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018234813 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3643097 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/02, H04L29/06, G06F21/62, G06Q30/02, H04L29/08, H04L12/58 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
H04L63/0435 (EP,US);
G06F21/602 (US);
H04L51/214 (EP);
H04L63/062 (EP,US);
H04L63/101 (EP,US);
H04L9/14 (US);
H04W12/033 (EP);
G06F21/6254 (EP);
G06Q30/0271 (EP);
G06Q30/0277 (EP);
H04L51/52 (EP);
H04L63/045 (EP);
H04L67/53 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DES ZUGRIFFS AUF DATEN | [2020/18] | English: | CONTROLLING ACCESS TO DATA | [2020/18] | French: | COMMANDE D'ACCÈS À DES DONNÉES | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 22.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   02.01.2024 | 30.06.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2015553 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0038] - [0044] - [0 51] - [0058]; figures 7, 12 *; | [X]US8601263 (SHANKAR UMESH [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * Column 13, line 57 - column 15, line 45;; figures 4, 7 *; | [A] - JIANG JINGHUA ET AL, "Towards secure and practical targeted mobile advertising", 2015 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS WORKSHOPS (INFOCOM WKSHPS), IEEE, (20150426), doi:10.1109/INFCOMW.2015.7179352, pages 79 - 80, XP033190148 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOMW.2015.7179352 | [A] - OZCAN AHMET TALHA ET AL, BabelCrypt: The Universal Encryption Layer for Mobile Messaging Applications, MEDICAL IMAGE COMPUTING AND COMPUTER-ASSISTED INTERVENTION - MICCAI 2015 : 18TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, MUNICH, GERMANY, OCTOBER 5-9, 2015; PROCEEDINGS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, CH, (20150716), ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-642-11294-2, XP047314772 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-662-47854-7_21 |