EP3642679 - ENHANCED MONITORING METHOD IN A DRUG CONTAINERS HANDLING LINE AND DRUG CONTAINERS HANDLING LINE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuova Ompi S.r.l. Via Molinella, 17 35017 Piombino Dese (PD) / IT | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUREAU, Christophe c/o Nuova Ompi S.R.L. Via Molinella 17 35017 Piombino Dese Padova / IT | 02 /
URQUHART, Tod c/o Nuova Ompi S.R.L. Via Molinella 17 35017 Piombino Dese Padova / IT | 03 /
LETEURTRE, Pierre-Emmanuel c/o Nuova Ompi S.R.L. Via Molinella 17 35017 Piombino Dese Padova / IT | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Mitola, Marco Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza Mario Saggin, 2 35131 Padova / IT | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18737423.6 | 19.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018IB54507 | Priority number, date | IT20170068513 | 20.06.2017 Original published format: IT201700068513 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018234993 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3642679 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, B65C9/46 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
G05B19/4183 (EP,US);
B65B3/003 (US);
A61J1/00 (US);
B65C9/46 (EP,US);
B65G43/10 (US);
B65G47/26 (US);
G05B19/4189 (EP,US);
A61J2205/10 (US);
A61J2205/60 (US);
B65G2203/0216 (US);
G05B2219/31432 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP);
Y02P90/80 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES ÜBERWACHUNGSVERFAHREN IN EINER ARZNEIMITTELBEHÄLTERHANDHABUNGSLINIE UND ARZNEIMITTELBEHÄLTERHANDHABUNGSLINIE DAFÜR | [2020/18] | English: | ENHANCED MONITORING METHOD IN A DRUG CONTAINERS HANDLING LINE AND DRUG CONTAINERS HANDLING LINE THEREOF | [2020/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE RENFORCÉ DANS UNE LIGNE DE MANIPULATION DE RÉCIPIENTS DE MÉDICAMENTS ET SA LIGNE DE MANIPULATION DE RÉCIPIENTS DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 05.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 22.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.10.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO0163368 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-19 * page 1 * * page 3 - page 4 * * page 8 * * page 13 - page 16 * * figures 3-4 *; | [A]WO03038738 (INT BARCODE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-19* page 1 - page 5 *; | [I]WO2013079409 (SICPA HOLDING SA [CH]) [I] 1-19 * page 1 * * page 3 - page 5 * * page 18 - page 22 * * figure 1 * |