EP3665049 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A FRICTION VALUE FOR A CONTACT BETWEEN A TYRE OF A VEHICLE AND A ROAD, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE FUNCTION OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEISLER, Simon Lixstrasse 21 74072 Heilbronn / DE | 02 /
LELLMANN, Christian Zabergaeustrasse 52 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18737498.8 | 15.06.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018EP66002 | Priority number, date | DE201710214026 | 11.08.2017 Original published format: DE102017214026 | [2020/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019029875 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3665049 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3665049 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/172 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
B60T8/172 (EP);
B60W40/068 (EP);
B60T2210/122 (EP);
B60W2555/20 (EP);
B60W2556/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINES REIBWERTS FÜR EINEN KONTAKT ZWISCHEN EINEM REIFEN EINES FAHRZEUGS UND EINER FAHRBAHN UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER FAHRZEUGFUNKTION EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2022/17] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A FRICTION VALUE FOR A CONTACT BETWEEN A TYRE OF A VEHICLE AND A ROAD, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE FUNCTION OF A VEHICLE | [2020/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UN COEFFICIENT DE FROTTEMENT POUR UN CONTACTE ENTRE UN PNEU D'UN VÉHICULE ET UNE CHAUSSÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE FONCTION D'UN VÉHICULE | [2020/25] |
Former [2020/25] | VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINES REIBWERTS FÜR EINEN KONTAKT ZWISCHEN EINEM REIFEN EINES FAHRZEUGS UND EINER FAHRBAHN UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER FAHRZEUGFUNKTION EINES FAHRZEUGs | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 11.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 10.08.2022 | CZ | 10.08.2022 | DK | 10.08.2022 | EE | 10.08.2022 | ES | 10.08.2022 | FI | 10.08.2022 | HR | 10.08.2022 | IT | 10.08.2022 | LT | 10.08.2022 | LV | 10.08.2022 | MC | 10.08.2022 | NL | 10.08.2022 | PL | 10.08.2022 | RO | 10.08.2022 | RS | 10.08.2022 | SE | 10.08.2022 | SI | 10.08.2022 | SK | 10.08.2022 | SM | 10.08.2022 | NO | 10.11.2022 | GR | 11.11.2022 | IS | 10.12.2022 | PT | 12.12.2022 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 10.08.2022 | |
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 10.08.2022 | |
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2011144875 (RADO ZOLTAN IVAN [US]) [X] 1,4-10 * paragraphs [0178] , [0179] * * claim 6 * [Y] 2,3; | [X]DE102012112725 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,7-10 * paragraph [0024] * * claim 1 *; | [XY]US2015142388 (METZGER RICHARD PAUL [US]) [X] 1,4-10 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 3,5,7 * [Y] 2,3; | [XY]DE102015201383 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-10 * paragraphs [0027] , [0031] * [Y] 2,3; | [Y] - TAE J. KWON ET AL, "Modelling of winter road surface temperature (RST) - A GIS-based approach", 2017 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TRANSPORTATION INFORMATION AND SAFETY (ICTIS), (20170801), doi:10.1109/ICTIS.2017.8047820, ISBN 978-1-5386-0437-3, pages 551 - 556, XP055501555 [Y] 2,3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICTIS.2017.8047820 | [Y] - Bayley, "Ordinary Kriging (Ch. 5.5 -Bailey & Gatrell)", (20120322), URL: https://msu.edu/~ashton/classes/866/papers/gatrell_ordkrige.pdf, (20180820), XP055500710 [Y] 2,3 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102005060219 |