EP3649779 - A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR PICTURE ENCODING AND DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings, SAS 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2022/44] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings, SAS 3 Rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2020/20] | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEVANCE, Christophe c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 F-35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 02 /
HIRON, Franck c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 F-35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 03 /
FRANCOIS, Edouard c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 F-35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Interdigital Immeuble ZEN 2 845 A, avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/20] | Rolland, Sophie InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 18737866.6 | 02.07.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018EP67847 | Priority number, date | EP20170305884 | 06.07.2017 Original published format: EP 17305884 | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019007917 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3649779 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/126, H04N19/186, H04N19/157 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
H04N19/126 (EP,US);
H04N19/157 (EP);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDCODIERUNG UND -DECODIERUNG | [2020/20] | English: | A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR PICTURE ENCODING AND DECODING | [2020/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DESTINÉS AU CODAGE ET DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 12.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004013202 (LAINEMA JANI [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0095] *; | [I]US2008175496 (SEGALL CHRISTOPHER A [US]) [I] 15,16* paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] *; | [A]EP2672707 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] *; | [I]WO2017093188 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [I] 1-14 * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 12 * * page 10, line 3 - page 10, line 16 *; | [I] - SAMUELSSON J ET AL, "Conversion and Coding Practices for HDR/WCG Y"2CbCr 4:2:0 Video with PQ Transfer Characteristics (Draft 4)", 26. JCT-VC MEETING; 12-1-2017 - 20-1-2017; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20170211), no. JCTVC-Z1017, XP030118169 [I] 1-14 * page 20, paragraph 8 - page 24, paragraph 8.4; figure 1 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, paragraph 5 * * abstract * | [A] - Anonymous, "Report ITU-R BT.2390-0 High dynamic range television for production and international programme exchange BT Series Broadcasting service (television)", (20160101), URL: https://www.itu.int/dms_pub/itu-r/opb/rep/R-REP-BT.2390-2016-PDF-E.pdf, (20170620), XP055383019 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [I] - IWAMURA S ET AL, "AHG7: On the need of luma delta QP for BT.2100 HLG content", 7. JVET MEETING; 13-7-2017 - 21-7-2017; TORINO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JVET/,, (20170705), no. JVET-G0059, XP030150841 [I] 15,16 * the whole document * |