EP3638501 - DEVICE FOR MICRO-EMBOSSING OF PAPER AND PAPER PROCESSING LINE COMPRISING SAID DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAMBINI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PICCHI, Fabio Via della Santina 23 55013 Lammari (LU) / IT | 02 /
BUFFA, Giovanni Via Trieste 6 51019 Ponte Buggianese (PT) / IT | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2024/21] |
Former [2020/17] | Frasson, Luca, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 18737992.0 | 13.06.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018IB54311 | Priority number, date | IT20170065732 | 14.06.2017 Original published format: IT201700065732 | [2020/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018229676 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3638501 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3638501 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3638501 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/07 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
B31F1/07 (EP,US);
B65H16/00 (US);
B65H18/08 (US);
B65H37/04 (US);
D21F11/006 (US);
D21F3/0281 (US);
D21F3/086 (US);
D21H27/02 (US);
B31F2201/0715 (EP);
B31F2201/0743 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0753 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0756 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM MIKROPRÄGEN VON PAPIER UND PAPIERVERARBEITUNGSANLAGE MIT DIESER VORRICHTUNG | [2020/17] | English: | DEVICE FOR MICRO-EMBOSSING OF PAPER AND PAPER PROCESSING LINE COMPRISING SAID DEVICE | [2020/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MICRO-GAUFRAGE DE PAPIER ET CHAÎNE DE TRAITEMENT DE PAPIER COMPRENANT LEDIT DISPOSITIF | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 14.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.02.2022
23.02.2022
ADMISSIBLE Paper Converting Machine Company 2300 South Ashland Avenue PO Box 19005 Green Bay, WI 54307-9005 / US Opponent's representative Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/21] |
Former [2022/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.02.2022
23.02.2022
ADMISSIBLE Paper Converting Machine Company 2300 South Ashland Avenue PO Box 19005 Green Bay, WI 54307-9005 / US Opponent's representative Madgwick, Paul Roland Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | 26.04.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.09.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.09.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.03.2024 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.06.2018 | AL | 26.05.2021 | CY | 26.05.2021 | CZ | 26.05.2021 | DK | 26.05.2021 | EE | 26.05.2021 | HR | 26.05.2021 | LT | 26.05.2021 | LV | 26.05.2021 | MC | 26.05.2021 | MK | 26.05.2021 | NL | 26.05.2021 | RO | 26.05.2021 | SI | 26.05.2021 | SK | 26.05.2021 | SM | 26.05.2021 | IE | 13.06.2021 | LU | 13.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | BG | 26.08.2021 | NO | 26.08.2021 | GR | 27.08.2021 | IS | 26.09.2021 | PT | 27.09.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.06.2018 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.06.2021 | ||
LU | 13.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.06.2021 | ||
LU | 13.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.06.2021 | ||
LU | 13.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.06.2021 | ||
LU | 13.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.06.2021 | ||
LU | 13.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.06.2021 | ||
LU | 13.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.06.2021 | ||
LU | 13.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.06.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | HR | 26.05.2021 | |
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | HR | 26.05.2021 | |
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 26.05.2021 | |
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | HR | 26.05.2021 | |
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 26.05.2021 | |
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | LT | 26.05.2021 | |
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 26.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1964312 (BRIGHT CHARLES G) [Y] 1-8,13,14 * page 1, line 92 - line 95 *; | [Y]US2018244 (ALM ALEXANDER V) [Y] 1-8,13,14 * page 4, column left, line 47 - line 49; figure 4 *; | [Y]US2091572 (SWAN JOSEPH H) [Y] 1-8,13,14 * page 2, column right, line 62 - line 67 *; | [A]US5007271 (BOEGLI KARL [CH]) [A] 10 * column 3, line 1 - line 16; figure 2 *; | [YA]US5862750 (DELL OLMO GIANCARLO [IT]) [Y] 1-8,13,14 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 56; figure 1 * [A] 9-12; | [A]US2006243383 (GELLI MAURO [IT], et al) [A] 9 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2009126885 (AKAI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 6,7 * paragraph [0057]; figures 3, 4,8 *; | [Y]US2009134534 (KOIVUKUNNAS PEKKA [FI], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0067] *; | [A]US2011020605 (SUZUKI SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 10 * paragraphs [0054] , [0174]; figure 2c *; | [Y]JP2015074098 (KAWANO PAPER CO LTD) [Y] 2-4,7,8,13 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP3037253 (BOEGLI GRAVURES SA [CH]) [A] 11,12* paragraph [0084]; figure 60c * | Opposition | US6913673 | WO2006133389 | JP2007015379 | JP2012110407 |