EP3569673 - SURFACE TREATMENT AGENT CONTAINING PERFLUORO(POLY)ETHER GROUP-CONTAINING COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUHASHI, Hisashi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
NOSE, Masatoshi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 03 /
OZAWA, Kaori c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 04 /
YAMASHITA, Tsuneo c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 18738480.5 | 11.01.2018 | [2019/47] | WO2018JP00501 | Priority number, date | JP20170003662 | 12.01.2017 Original published format: JP 2017003662 | [2019/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018131656 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3569673 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3569673 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18, C08G65/04, C08G65/325, C08L71/00, C09D5/16, C09D7/40, C09D171/02, C09D7/65, C08G65/329, G02B1/18, // G02B1/11 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
G02B1/18 (EP);
C09D171/02 (EP,KR);
C09D5/1637 (US);
C08G65/007 (US);
C08G65/04 (EP,KR);
C08G65/325 (EP,KR);
C08G65/329 (EP,KR);
C08G65/33317 (US);
C08G65/336 (US);
C08L71/00 (EP);
C09D5/16 (KR);
C09D7/40 (KR);
C09D7/48 (US);
C09D7/65 (EP);
C09K3/18 (EP,KR);
G02B1/10 (US);
G02B1/14 (KR);
C08G2150/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/47] | C09K3/18, C08G65/04, C08G65/325, C08L71/00, C09D5/16, C09D7/40, C09D171/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL MIT PERFLUOR(POLY)ETHERGRUPPENHALTIGER VERBINDUNG | [2019/47] | English: | SURFACE TREATMENT AGENT CONTAINING PERFLUORO(POLY)ETHER GROUP-CONTAINING COMPOUND | [2019/47] | French: | AGENT DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE COMPRENANT UN COMPOSÉ CONTENANT UN GROUPE PERFLUORO(POLY)ÉTHER | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2019 | Translation filed | 04.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 26.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2022 | AT | 31.08.2022 | CZ | 31.08.2022 | DK | 31.08.2022 | EE | 31.08.2022 | ES | 31.08.2022 | FI | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | NL | 31.08.2022 | PL | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SE | 31.08.2022 | SI | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | NO | 30.11.2022 | GR | 01.12.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | IE | 11.01.2023 | LU | 11.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
IE | 11.01.2023 | ||
LU | 11.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 11.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 11.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 11.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7148360 (FLYNN RICHARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-13 * * examples 1-18 *; | [A]EP2915833 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-41 * * examples 1-20 *; | [A]WO2016190047 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-24 ** examples 1-4 * | International search | [A]JP2015168785 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-16 * , *; | [A]JP2016132719 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-16 * , *; | [A]WO2016121211 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * 2016-145326 A & K *; | [PA]WO2017038305 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-16* 2017-48370 A * | by applicant | WO9707155 | WO2014069592 |