EP3570293 - METHOD OF HANDLING RADIOACTIVE SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states State Atomic Energy Corporation "Rosatom" on Behalf of The Russian Federation Bolshaya Ordynka Street 24 Moscow 119017 / RU | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIZIN, Andrey Anatolievich Bratskaya str. 27 app. 85 Dimitrovgrad Ulyanovsk region 433515 / RU | 02 /
TOMILIN, Sergey Vasilievich Tereshkovoi str. 4 app. 64 Dimitrovgrad Ulyanovsk region 433507 / RU | 03 /
POGLYAD, Sergey Stepanovich Lenina str. 37b korpus 2 app. 51 Dimitrovgrad Ulyanovsk region 433506 / RU | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Bojinova, Fanny Vladimirova Patent and Trademark Bureau "Bojinov & Bojinov" Ltd. 38, Alabin Street P.O. Box 728 1000 Sofia / BG | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 18738961.4 | 16.01.2018 | [2019/47] | WO2018RU00010 | Priority number, date | RU20170101380 | 16.01.2017 Original published format: RU 2017101380 | [2019/47] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018132041 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | RU | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570293 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3570293 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/465, C04B35/49, C04B35/626, C04B35/653, G21F9/16, G21F9/14, G21F9/30, G21F9/08, C04B35/64, C04B35/46 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
G21F9/14 (EP);
G21F9/16 (EP,KR,RU);
G21F9/162 (EP,US);
C04B35/46 (EP,US);
C04B35/465 (EP);
C04B35/49 (EP);
C04B35/62675 (EP);
C04B35/64 (US);
C04B35/653 (EP);
G21F9/08 (EP,US);
G21F9/302 (EP,US);
G21F9/305 (EP);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3267 (EP);
C04B2235/3268 (US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/442 (EP);
C04B2235/443 (EP);
C04B2235/656 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | G21F9/16, G21F9/14, G21F9/30, G21F9/08, C04B35/46, C04B35/64 | ||
Former IPC [2019/47] | G21F9/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG RADIOAKTIVER LÖSUNGEN | [2019/47] | English: | METHOD OF HANDLING RADIOACTIVE SOLUTIONS | [2019/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MANIPULATION DE SOLUTIONS RADIOACTIVES | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2019 | Translation filed | 15.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 13.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.04.2022 | AT | 13.04.2022 | CZ | 13.04.2022 | DK | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | ES | 13.04.2022 | FI | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | IT | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | NL | 13.04.2022 | PL | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SE | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 13.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4119561 (DROBNIK STEFAN, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 65 - column 4, line 31 *; | [A]FR2394155 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE]) [A] 1-3* examples 1-5 *; | [A]RU2131627 (PROIZV OB EDINENIE MAJAK) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 5; example 2 *; | [AD]RU2153717 (MO GP OB EDINE, et al) [AD] 1-3 * page 2, line 63 - page 4, line 13 *; | [AD]RU2315381 (MOSNO RADON ECOLOGY TECHN ASSOC) [AD] 1-3 * page 4, line 45 - page 5, line 5; claims 1,2 *; | [A]CN103723915 (LIYANG ZHEDA ACADEMIA RES SERVICE CT CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [A]RU2131627 (PROIZV OB EDINENIE MAJAK) [A] 1-3 * , example 2 *; | [DA]RU2153717 (MO GP OB EDINE, et al) [DA] 1-3 * , the claims *; | [DA]RU2315381 (GOSUDARSTVENNOE UNITARNOE PREDPRIYATIE GORODA MOSKVY - OBIEDINENNY EKO) [DA] 1-3 * , the claims *; | [A]CN103723915 (LIYANG ZHEDA ACADEMIA RES SERVICE CT CO LTD) [A] 1-3* , the abstract * | by applicant | RU2153717 | RU2315381 |