EP3569695 - EXTRACELLULAR VESICLE ISOLATION METHOD USING METAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosetta Exosome Park Tower, Yongsan-dong 5ga, 103-1502 67 Seobinggo-ro Seobinggo-ro Yongsan-gu Seoul 04385 / KR | [2020/30] |
Former [2019/47] | For all designated states Rosetta Exosome Park Tower Yongsan-dong 5gam, 103-1502 67 Seobinggo-ro Seobinggo-ro Yongsan-gu Seoul 04385 / KR | ||
For all designated states Postech Academy-Industry Foundation (Jigok-dong) 77 Cheongam-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37673 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHO, Yong Song (Gyosu Apt. Jigok-dong) 4-1003 155 Jigok-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37673 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Chang Jin (Metro Palace 1danji Apt. Manchon-dong) 103-202 135 Dongwon-ro Suseong-gu Daegu 42038 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Hyun Taek (Hyoja-dong) 202 28 Hyoseong-ro 15beon-gil Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37836 / KR | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18739212.1 | 15.01.2018 | [2019/47] | WO2018KR00673 | Priority number, date | KR20170006430 | 13.01.2017 Original published format: KR 20170006430 | [2019/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018131966 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3569695 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/074, C12N1/16, C12N1/20, B01D15/38 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
C12N1/16 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0696 (KR);
B01D15/3828 (US);
B01D15/424 (US);
B01J20/3265 (US);
C12N1/20 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0602 (US);
G01N33/54306 (EP);
B01D15/34 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Title | German: | ISOLATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR EXTRAZELLULÄRE VESIKEL UNTER VERWENDUNG VON METALL | [2019/47] | English: | EXTRACELLULAR VESICLE ISOLATION METHOD USING METAL | [2019/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ISOLEMENT DE VÉSICULES EXTRACELLULAIRES UTILISANT UN MÉTAL | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2019 | Translation filed | 11.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2019/47] | 11.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 03.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 11.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.01.2020 | Decision despatched | 11.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.01.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 11.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.01.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 11.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.01.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 11.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.01.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 11.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2019 | Decision despatched | 11.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2004185545 (SIMPSON DANIEL J [US], et al) [X] 1 * Capturing membrane vesicles using 3-aminopropyl magnetic silica particles.;; examples 7, 8 *[A] 2-12; | [XA]EP2941629 (EXOSOME DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0047] , [ 0048] , [ 0050] - paragraph [0054] * [A] 2-12; | [I] - ALVES NATHAN J ET AL, "Affinity purification of bacterial outer membrane vesicles (OMVs) utilizing a His-tag mutant", RESEARCH IN MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20161020), vol. 168, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.RESMIC.2016.10.001, ISSN 0923-2508, pages 139 - 146, XP029920068 [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 140, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * 2.4 His-tag purification; page 141, column 1 * * page 141, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 142, paragraph 2; figure 1 * * page 142, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 144, column 1, paragraph 1 * * 3.5 Advanced purification capabilities. OMV used as proof of concept. Applicable to the purification of other types of extracellular vesicles e.g. mammalian.; page 145, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 146, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.resmic.2016.10.001 | [XA] - Wako, "MagCaptureTM Exosome Isolation Kit PS", Wako Catalog, (20160120), URL: http://www.wako-chem.co.jp/english/labchem/product/life/exosome_isolation/pdf/pi.pdf, (20181026), XP055519267 [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-12 | [XA] - ANONYMOUS, "[Wako] Introducing MagCapture(TM) Exosome Isolation KitPS", INTERNET CITATION, (20160120), URL: http://www.seoulin.co.kr/shop/board/view.php?PHPSESSID=f5f53fa18670174394c8e48628d3d18b&id=newtech&subSpeech=Wako&no=884&PHPSESSID-f5f53fa18670174394c8e48628d3d18b, XP009516892 [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-12 | International search | [X] - WAKO, "MagCaptureTM Exosome Isolation Kit PS", Wako Catalog, (20160120), URL: http://www.wako-chem.co.jp/english/labchem/product/life/exosome_isolation/pdf/pi.pdf, XP055519267 [X] 1-30 * See inner pages 1, 4. ? Please refer to document D2 regarding publication date.) * | [L] - Anonymous, "Wako] Introducing MagCapture? Exosome Isolation KitPS.", SEOULIN BIOSCIENCE, (20160120), URL: http://www.seoulin.co.kr/shop/board/view.php?PHPSESSID=f5f53fa18670174394c8e48628d3d18b&id=newtech&subSpeech=Wako&no=884&PHPSESSID-f5f53fa18670174394c8e48628d3d18b, XP009516892 [L] 1-30 * See the entire document. * | [A] - ALVES, NATHAN J. et al., "Affinity Purification of Bacterial Outer Membrane Vesicles (OMVs) Utilizing a His-tag Mutant", Research in Microbiology, (20161020), vol. 168, no. 2, pages 139 - 146, XP029920068 [A] 1-30 * See the entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.resmic.2016.10.001 | [A] - BERKOVSKY, AARON L. et al., "Use of Metal-chelate Affinity Chromatography and Hydrophobic Interaction Chromatography for Purification of Placental Protein 12", journal of Chromatography B: Biomedical Sciences and Applications, (19940617), vol. 656, no. 2, pages 432 - 435, XP026508359 [A] 1-30 * See the entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-4347(94)00127-8 | [A] - NAKAI, WATARU et al., "A Novel Affinity-based Method for the Isolation of Highly Purified Extracellular Vesicles", Scientific Reports, (20160923), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 1 - 11, XP055519274 [A] 1-30 * See the entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep33935 |