EP3570644 - THUNDERBOLT ARREST-TYPE LIGHTNING PROTECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lightning Suppression Systems Co., Ltd. 44F Yokohama Landmark Tower 2-1 Minatomirai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8144 / JP | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Toshio c/o Lightning Suppression Systems Co., Ltd. 44F Yokohama Landmark Tower 2-1 Minatomirai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8144 / JP | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 18739255.0 | 11.01.2018 | [2019/47] | WO2018JP00524 | Priority number, date | JP20170002934 | 11.01.2017 Original published format: JP 2017002934 | [2019/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018131660 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570644 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05F3/04, H02G13/00 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
H02G13/80 (EP,US);
H02G13/40 (EP,US);
H05F3/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/47] | H05F3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Title | German: | BLITZSCHLAGAUFNEHMENDE BLITZSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG | [2019/47] | English: | THUNDERBOLT ARREST-TYPE LIGHTNING PROTECTION DEVICE | [2019/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA FOUDRE DE TYPE ANTI-ENCASTREMENT | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2019 | Translation filed | 09.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 12.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 22.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH113796 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002271964 (KANSAI TECH CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [XAI]JP5876845B (RAILWAY TECHNICAL RES INST) [X] 5 * abstract * [A] 1-4 [I] 6-8; | [A] - SZCZERBINSKI M ED - SZEDENIK NORBERT, "A discussion of `Faraday cage' lightning protection and application to real building structures", JOURNAL OF ELECTROSTATICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000101), vol. 48, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0304-3886(99)00062-5, ISSN 0304-3886, pages 145 - 154, XP004244680 [A] 1-8 * Section 3: "How does the Faraday cage ...";; figures 6-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3886(99)00062-5 | [A] - MAMIS MEHMET SALIH ET AL, "Lightning surge analysis of Faraday cage using alternative transient program-electromagnetic transients program", IET GENERATION, TRANSMISSION&DISTRIBUTION, IET, UK, (20160310), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:10.1049/IET-GTD.2015.0794, ISSN 1751-8687, pages 1016 - 1022, XP006055755 [A] 1-8 * Section 3: "ATP model of Faraday Cage";; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/iet-gtd.2015.0794 | International search | [A]JP3088727U (ISHIKAWA, Hitoshi) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0007], fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016181497 (DINNTECO INT S L) [A] 1-8* , paragraphs [0001]-[0031], fig. 1, 2 & US 2016/0285248 A1, paragraphs [0001]-[0032], fig. 1, 2 & WO 2016/151173 A1 & CN 106028612 A * | by applicant | JPS5839331B |