EP3568482 - ALPHA-1 ANTITRYPSIN (AAT) RNAI AGENTS, COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING AAT RNAI AGENTS, AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arrowhead Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 177 E. Colorado Boulevard, Suite 700 Pasadena, CA 91105 / US | [2020/32] |
Former [2019/47] | For all designated states Arrowhead Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 225 South Lake Avenue Suite 1050 Pasadena, CA 91101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zhen Arrowhead Pharmaceuticals Inc. 502 S. Rosa Road Madison WI 53719 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Rui Arrowhead Pharmaceuticals Inc. 502 S. Rosa Road Madison WI 53719 / US | 03 /
WOODDELL, Christine, I. Arrowhead Pharmaceuticals Inc. 502 S. Rosa Road Madison WI 53719 / US | 04 /
PEI, Tao Arrowhead Pharmaceuticals Inc. 502 S. Rosa Road Madison WI 53719 / US | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | van Kooij, Adriaan, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 18739290.7 | 10.01.2018 | [2019/47] | WO2018US13102 | Priority number, date | US201762444452P | 10.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762444452 P | US201762486720P | 18.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762486720 P | US201762596232P | 08.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762596232 P | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018132432 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3568482 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,IL,US);
G01N33/6893 (IL,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/317 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/32 (IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/321 (IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/322 (IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/333 (IL,US);
C12N2310/334 (IL,US);
C12N2310/335 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/336 (IL,US);
C12N2310/343 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/346 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/351 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/3521 (IL);
C12N2310/3533 (IL);
C12N2320/31 (IL,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q2600/158 (IL,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP,US);
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3533 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Title | German: | ALPHA-1-ANTITRYPSIN (AAT)-RNAI-MITTEL, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT AAT-RNAI-MITTELN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2019/47] | English: | ALPHA-1 ANTITRYPSIN (AAT) RNAI AGENTS, COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING AAT RNAI AGENTS, AND METHODS OF USE | [2019/47] | French: | AGENTS DE TYPE ARN D'INTERFÉRENCE (ARNI) D'ALPHA-1 ANTITRYPSINE (AAT), COMPOSITIONS LES CONTENANT, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 10.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2012178033 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) | International search | [Y]WO2015188197 (SOLSTICE BIOLOG LTD [IE], et al); | [Y]US2015361427 (WOODDELL CHRISTINE I [US], et al); | [XY]US2016244752 (SEHGAL ALFICA [US], et al) |