EP3570305 - WOUND CORE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/47] | WOUND CORE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
[2024/10] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008071 / JP | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIZUMURA Takahito c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
MIZOKAMI Masato c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
YABUMOTO Masao c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 04 /
UEMURA Toshihiko c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 05 /
MINEMATSU Eisuke c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 06 /
TAKAHASHI Fumiaki c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 18739316.0 | 10.01.2018 | [2019/47] | WO2018JP00364 | Priority number, date | JP20170001829 | 10.01.2017 Original published format: JP 2017001829 | [2019/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018131613 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570305 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/245, H01F1/147, H01F41/02 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H01F41/024 (EP,US);
H01F27/25 (KR,RU);
H01F27/2455 (EP,US);
H01F1/147 (RU,US);
H01F1/14775 (KR);
H01F41/02 (RU);
H01F41/0213 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/47] | H01F27/25, H01F1/147, H01F41/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Title | German: | GEWICKELTER KERN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/10] | English: | WOUND CORE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2024/10] | French: | NOYAU ENROULÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2024/10] |
Former [2019/47] | GEWICKELTER KERN UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2019/47] | WOUND CORE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
Former [2019/47] | NOYAU ENROULÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2019 | Translation filed | 22.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 12.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2023 | 09.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.01.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3451130 (ELLIS BELVIN B); | [XAI]EP0202339 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]); | [A]JPH1032132 (KAWATETSU DENSETSU KK); | [A]JP4360667B ; | [A]EP2180082 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]); | [XAI]EP2770075 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]); | [A]EP2799594 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]); | [A]JP3197588U ; | [A]JP2016028406 (TOSHIBA IND PRODUCTS & SYSTEMS CORP) | International search | [A]JPS62270723 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]JPH1032132 (KAWATETSU DENSETSU KK); | [A]JP2009052060 (JFE STEEL KK); | [A]JP2011243792 (TAKAOKA KASEI KOGYO KK, et al); | [A]JP2012161114 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]WO2013058239 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2017001829 |