EP3652008 - HOLDER FOR SUN-SHADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/21] | MOUNTING FOR A FLAT ELEMENT OF A SUN PROTECTION OR DIMMING DEVICE, AND SUN PROTECTION OR DIMMING DEVICE | ||
[2024/03] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windesa GmbH Kiebitzheide 47 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORNER, Norbert 49078 Osnabrück / DE | [2024/14] |
Former [2020/21] | 01 /
BORNER, Norbert Bismarckstrasse 35 49076 Osnabrück / DE | Representative(s) | Wischmeyer, André, et al Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Großhandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18739506.6 | 05.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018EP68280 | Priority number, date | DE201720104204U | 14.07.2017 Original published format: DE 202017104204 U | [2020/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019011783 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3652008 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3652008 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/20 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
B60J1/2011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTER FÜR EIN FLÄCHENELEMENT EINER SONNENSCHUTZ- ODER VERDUNKLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SONNENSCHUTZ- ODER VERDUNKLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/21] | English: | HOLDER FOR SUN-SHADE | [2024/03] | French: | SUPPORT POUR PARE-SOLEIL | [2024/03] |
Former [2020/21] | MOUNTING FOR A FLAT ELEMENT OF A SUN PROTECTION OR DIMMING DEVICE, AND SUN PROTECTION OR DIMMING DEVICE | ||
Former [2020/21] | SUPPORT POUR ÉLÉMENT DE SURFACE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'OCCULTATION OU DE PROTECTION SOLAIRE ET DISPOSITIF D'OCCULTATION OU DE PROTECTION SOLAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 07.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | 22.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.11.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 06.08.2020 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal incapacity of applicant | [2020/39] | 01.04.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2021/07] | 06.08.2020 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal incapacity of applicant | [2021/07] | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2015047137 (GRIGOREV DMITRY LVOVICH [RU], et al); | [YA]US9272605 (GONG JING-SHYONG [TW]); |