EP3645295 - TRANSFER PRINTER AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Videojet Technologies Inc. 1500 Mittel Boulevard Wood Dale, IL 60191 / US | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIS, Jeremy c/o Videojet Technologies (Nottingham) Limited 7 Faraday Building Nottingham Science&Technology Park University Boulevard Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG7 2QP / GB | 02 /
HART, Philip 25 Springfield Drive Nuthall Nottingham NG6 8WB / GB | 03 /
WALLEY, Gareth c/o Videojet Technologies (Nottingham) Limited 7 Faraday Building Nottingham Science&Technology Park University Boulevard Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG7 2QP / GB | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/21] |
Former [2020/19] | Stott, James Edward Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18739589.2 | 27.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018GB51796 | Priority number, date | GB20170010350 | 28.06.2017 Original published format: GB 201710350 | GB20170010351 | 28.06.2017 Original published format: GB 201710351 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019002857 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645295 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3645295 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B41J35/36, B41J29/393, B41J17/36, B41J2/36, B41J17/02, B41J17/07, B41J17/10, B41J33/16 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
B41J2/36 (EP,US);
B41J29/393 (CN);
B41J2/325 (US);
B41F16/0026 (US);
B41J17/02 (EP);
B41J17/07 (EP,US);
B41J17/10 (EP,US);
B41J17/36 (EP);
B41J2/32 (CN);
B41J33/16 (EP,US);
B41J33/34 (CN);
B41J33/36 (US);
B41J35/36 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | B41J35/36, B41J2/36, B41J17/36, B41J29/393 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSFERDRUCKER UND VERFAHREN | [2020/19] | English: | TRANSFER PRINTER AND METHOD | [2020/19] | French: | IMPRIMANTE À TRANSFERT ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 18.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24172482.2 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]JPS60131286 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [IA]WO2013025746 (VIDEOJET TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) |