EP3679568 - TECHNIQUES FOR COMPENSATING VARIABLE DISPLAY DEVICE LATENCY IN IMAGE DISPLAY OF VIRTUAL REALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2020/29] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEUNG, Andrew Zicheng MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
WILSON, Brent Michael MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
ELLIOTT, Jack Andrew MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
SANDY, Matthew David MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
BOULTON, Michael George MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
YOU, Yang MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 18740442.1 | 22.06.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018US38880 | Priority number, date | US201762556118P | 08.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762556118 P | US201815896712 | 14.02.2018 Original published format: US201815896712 | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019050605 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3679568 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/34, G06F3/147 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
G06F3/147 (EP,US);
G06T15/205 (US);
G02B27/017 (US);
G02B27/0179 (US);
G06F3/012 (US);
G06T15/00 (EP,US);
G09G5/346 (EP,US);
G06T2215/16 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0261 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUR KOMPENSATION VON VARIABLER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNGSLATENZ IN DER BILDANZEIGE VON VIRTUELLER REALITÄT | [2020/29] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR COMPENSATING VARIABLE DISPLAY DEVICE LATENCY IN IMAGE DISPLAY OF VIRTUAL REALITY | [2020/29] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE COMPENSATION DE LATENCE DE DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE VARIABLE DANS UN AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE DE RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 02.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/27] | 30.01.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.02.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2066124 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0085]; figures 5-8 *; | [X]WO2015167908 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0086] *; | [IP]US2018047332 (KUWAHARA ATSUO [US], et al) [IP] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1-10 *; | [A] - VAN WAVEREN J M P, "The asynchronous time warp for virtual reality on consumer hardware", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 22ND ACM CONFERENCE ON VIRTUAL REALITY SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY , VRST '16, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA, (20161102), doi:10.1145/2993369.2993375, ISBN 978-1-4503-4491-3, pages 37 - 46, XP058306942 [A] 1-15 * page 38, column l, paragraph 6 - page 38, column r, paragraph 4; figure 1 * * page 39, column l, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 39, column r, paragraph 5 - page 40, column l, paragraph 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2993369.2993375 |