EP3570832 - COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS INHIBITORS OF INDOLEAMINE 2,3-DIOXYGENASE AND/OR TRYPTOPHAN DIOXYGENASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board Of Regents, The University Of Texas System 210 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIS, Richard, T. 3SCR3.4410 1901 East Road Houston Texas 77054 / US | 02 /
HAMILTON, Matthew 3SCR3.4410 1901 East Road Houston Texas 77054 / US | 03 /
JONES, Philip 3SCR3.4410 1901 East Road Houston Texas 77054 / US | 04 /
PETROCCHI, Alessia 3SCR3.4410 1901 East Road Houston Texas 77054 / US | 05 /
REYNA, Naphtali 3SCR3.4410 1901 East Road Houston Texas 77054 / US | 06 /
CROSS, Jason 3SCR3.4410 1901 East Road Houston Texas 77054 / US | 07 /
HAN, Michele 3SCR3.4410 1901 East Road Houston Texas 77054 / US | 08 /
SOTH, Michael 3SCR3.4410 1901 East Road Houston Texas 77054 / US | 09 /
MCAFOOS, Timothy 3SCR3.4410 1901 East Road Houston Texas 77054 / US | 10 /
TREMBLAY, Martin Tesaro Inc. 1000 Winter Street North Suite 3300 Waltham Massachusetts 02451 / US | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Bridle, Andrew Barry Bridle Intellectual Property Limited 6F Thomas Way Lakesview Internat. Business Park Canterbury, Kent CT3 4JZ / GB | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 18741114.5 | 16.01.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018US13914 | Priority number, date | US201762447368P | 17.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762447368 P | US201762458777P | 14.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762458777 P | US201762528366P | 03.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762528366 P | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018136437 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3570832 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/41, A61K31/433, C07D235/30, C07C233/70, C07C255/29, C07C311/07, C07C311/14, C07C311/20, C07D209/34, C07D209/38, C07D213/81, C07D215/233, C07D215/48, C07D237/28, C07D239/88, C07D241/24, C07D249/04, C07D309/12, C07D407/04, C07D471/04 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/015 (EP);
A61K31/4192 (US);
A61K31/166 (US);
A61K31/18 (US);
A61K31/351 (US);
A61K31/4015 (US);
A61K31/403 (EP);
A61K31/4184 (US);
A61K31/4196 (US);
A61K31/421 (US);
A61K31/4245 (US);
A61K31/437 (US);
A61K31/4402 (US);
A61K31/47 (US);
A61K31/4706 (US);
A61K31/4965 (US);
A61K31/50 (US);
A61K31/502 (US);
A61K31/517 (US);
A61K31/5375 (US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07C231/14 (US);
C07C233/65 (EP);
C07C233/70 (EP);
C07C233/78 (EP);
C07C233/84 (EP);
C07C237/20 (EP);
C07C247/14 (EP);
C07C255/44 (EP);
C07C255/57 (EP);
C07C255/58 (EP);
C07C307/02 (US);
C07C311/07 (EP);
C07C311/14 (EP);
C07C311/20 (EP);
C07D209/34 (EP);
C07D209/38 (EP,US);
C07D213/81 (EP);
C07D215/233 (EP);
C07D215/42 (US);
C07D215/48 (EP);
C07D235/08 (US);
C07D237/24 (US);
C07D237/28 (EP,US);
C07D239/88 (EP,US);
C07D241/24 (EP,US);
C07D249/04 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (US);
C07D263/22 (US);
C07D295/195 (US);
C07D309/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (US);
C07D401/12 (US);
C07D403/04 (US);
C07D403/06 (US);
C07D407/04 (EP);
C07D413/12 (US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP);
C07C2601/02 (EP);
C07C2602/18 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/015, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/403, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2019/48] | A61K31/41, A61K31/433, C07D235/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN ALS INHIBITOREN DER INDOLAMIN-2,3-DIOXYGENASE UND/ODER TRYPTOPHAN-DIOXYGENASE | [2019/48] | English: | COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS INHIBITORS OF INDOLEAMINE 2,3-DIOXYGENASE AND/OR TRYPTOPHAN DIOXYGENASE | [2019/48] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSÉS UTILES EN TANT QU'INHIBTEURS DE L'INDOLÉAMINE 2,3-DIOXYGÉNASE ET/OU DU TRYPTOPHANE DIOXYGÉNASE | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 04.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/52] | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/52] | Request for further processing for: | 03.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 03.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4177280 (BERKOZ BELIG [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * see preparation 6; column 12 * [A] 2-7,9-15; | [X]WO2004005252 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2016161960 (BEIGENE LTD, et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X] - Vichai Reutrakul ET AL, "A rapid entry to functionalized cyclohexanes and cyclopentanes via a one-pot, multicomponent annulations", Journal of the Science Society of Thailand (1996), 22(1), 83-87, Science Society of Thailand, (19960101), pages 83 - 87, URL: http://www.scienceasia.org/1996.22.n1/v22_083_087.pdf, (20200417), XP055686942 [X] 1 * page 86; compound 9 * | [X] - ARAI S ET AL, "Asymmetric Cyclopropanation Reaction Under Phase-Transfer Catalyzed Conditions", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER LTD, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990528), vol. 40, no. 22, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(99)00679-6, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 4215 - 4218, XP004164701 [X] 1 * page 4216; table 2; compound 2b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(99)00679-6 | [X] - PABLO WESSIG ET AL, "A New Photochemical Route to Cyclopropanes", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, DE, (20010316), vol. 40, no. 6, doi:10.1002/1521-3773(20010316)40:6<1064::AID-ANIE10640>3.0.CO;2-5, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 1064 - 1065, XP055686948 [X] 1 * page 1065; compound 15b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-3773(20010316)40:6<1064::AID-ANIE10640>3.0.CO;2-5 | [X] - ZHAO G ET AL, "Photochemical studies on exo-bicyclo[2.1.1]hexyl and bicyclo[3.1.0]hexyl aryl ketones: two approaches for synthesis of enantiomerically enriched cyclopentene derivatives", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 65, no. 48, doi:10.1016/J.TET.2009.10.011, ISSN 0040-4020, (20091128), pages 9952 - 9955, (20091008), XP026707912 [X] 1 * page 9953; compound 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2009.10.011 | [X] - HIROAKI HORIE ET AL, "Nickel-Catalyzed Cycloaddition of [alpha],[beta],[gamma],[delta]-Unsaturated Ketones with Alkynes", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, DE, (20110819), vol. 50, no. 38, doi:10.1002/anie.201104286, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 8956 - 8959, XP055686964 [X] 1 * page 8957; table 2; compound 3na * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201104286 | International search | [A]US2012046292 (KAWANO TOMOAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1* ; entire document *; | [A] - CREARY X., "Cyclopropyl triflates. Neighboring-group and solvent effects", Journal of the American Chemical Society, (19761013), vol. 98, no. 21, pages 6608 - 6613, XP055538263 [A] 1 * ; p6609 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00437a032 | [A] - KAPLAN L., "Photosolvation of benzene. Mechanism of formation of bicyclo[3.1.0]hex-3-en-2-yl and of bicyclo[3.1.0]hex-2-en-6-yl derivatives", Journal of the American Chemical Society, (19721129), vol. 94, no. 24, pages 8638 - 8640, XP055538266 [A] 1 * ; p8639 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00779a089 | [A] - JENDRALLA, "Desaminierung von N-(6-endo-Methylbicyclo[3.1.0]hex-6-exo-yl)- und N-(6-endo- Methylbicyclo[3.1.0]hex-2-en-6-exo-yl)-N-nitrosoharnstoff . Versuchte nicht-photochemische Erzeugung von trans-Cyclohexen-Derivaten", Chemische Berichte, (19801100), vol. 113, no. 11, pages 3585 - 3596, XP055538271 [A] 1 * ; p3588 * | [A] - "[(1S,5R)-6-Bicyclo[3.1.0]hexanyl]-phenylmethanoneStructure", Pubmed Compound, U.S. National Library of Medicine, (20070207), Database accession no. 12013505, URL: ncbi, XP055538275 [A] 1 |