EP3570967 - LOW COMPLEXITY FLOW CONTROL IN A MICROFLUIDIC MIXER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Life Sciences Solutions Canada ULC 655 West Kent Avenue N, Suite 50 Vancouver BC V6P 6T7 / CA | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/31] | For all designated states Precision Nanosystems ULC 655 West Kent Avenue N, Suite 50 Vancouver, BC V6P6T7 / CA | ||
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states Precision Nanosystems Inc 655 West Kent Avenue N Suite 50 Vancouver, British Columbia V6P 6T7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILD, Andre 2861 West 3rd Ave Vancouver, British Columbia V6K 1M8 / CA | 02 /
CHANG, Shao Fang Shannon 5394 Cliffridge Avenue North Vancouver, British Columbia V7R 4M4 / CA | 03 /
LEAVER, Timothy 4772 London Green Delta, British Columbia V4K 4X1 / CA | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Bannan, Sally Global Life Sciences Solutions Operations UK Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Venner, Julia Ann Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 18741376.0 | 17.01.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018CA50053 | Priority number, date | US201762447653P | 18.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762447653 P | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018132909 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570967 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01F15/02, B01F5/00, B81B1/00, B81B7/00, // B01F13/00 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
B01F33/3035 (EP,US);
B01F25/821 (US);
B01F35/712 (EP,US);
B01F35/71805 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/48] | B01F15/02, B01F5/00, B81B1/00, B81B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | NIEDERKOMPLEXE FLUSSSTEUERUNG IN EINEM MIKROFLUIDISCHEN MISCHER | [2019/48] | English: | LOW COMPLEXITY FLOW CONTROL IN A MICROFLUIDIC MIXER | [2019/48] | French: | CONTRÔLE D'ÉCOULEMENT À FAIBLE COMPLEXITÉ DANS UN MÉLANGEUR MICROFLUIDIQUE | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 28.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005133101 (CHUNG KWANG H [KR], et al) [X] 1-8,12-15 * figures 1, 4, 5 * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0058] * [I] 9-11; | [X]US2007028969 (BOVD PATRICK V [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0004] ** paragraphs [0017] - [0019] * | International search | [A]CA2439627 (GYROS AB [SE]) [A] 1 to 18 * The entire document *; | [A]US2006002817 (BOHM SEBASTIAN [GB], et al) [A] 1 to 18 * The entire document *; | [X]US2009120504 (ANDERSSON PER [SE], et al) [X] 1, 2 and 11 to 18 * Description pages 6 and 7, Figure 2 *; | [A]US2014038306 (BERTHIER ERWIN [US], et al) [A] 1 to 18* The entire document *; | [A]US2014356129 (PAUST NILS [DE], et al) [A] 1 to 18 * The entire document * |