EP3562119 - DATA PROCESSING METHOD, COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Xun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
QUAN, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Jian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 18741422.2 | 19.01.2018 | [2019/44] | WO2018CN73408 | Priority number, date | CN20171051870 | 20.01.2017 Original published format: CN201710051870 | [2019/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018133840 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562119 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L29/06, H04W80/02, // H04W28/06, H04W72/04 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
H04W80/02 (EP,CN,US);
H04L69/03 (CN);
H04L69/22 (EP);
H04L69/324 (EP,CN);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W72/56 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2019/44] | English: | DATA PROCESSING METHOD, COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2019/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION, ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2019 | Translation filed | 22.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 26.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/49] | 22.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2010102425 (ALCATEL LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL [CN], et al) [X] 1,5,9,13 * figures 1A, 1C, 2B, 7 * * paragraphs [0071] - [0074] * [I] 2-4,6-8,10-12,14,15; | [E]WO2018077043 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 4 ** paragraphs [0048] - [0059] * | International search | [A]CN102469410 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) [A] 1-32 * , entire document *; | [A]CN102868643 (SUZHOU SIMPLNANO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-32 * , entire document *; | [A]US2014379804 (WANG CHONGGANG [US], et al) [A] 1-32* , entire document *; | [X]CN105992242 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-32 * , description, paragraphs [0184]-[0216] and [0262]-[0275] * | by applicant | CN20171051870 |