EP3571065 - EXTERNALLY MOUNTED TIRE INFLATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Equalaire Systems, Inc. 1414 Valero Way Corpus Christi, TX 78409 / US | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNIG, Mark, Kevin 13942 Cabana North Corpus Christi TX 78418 / US | 02 /
GRAVELL, Jonathan 4323 Interstate Way San Antonio TX 78219 / US | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18741835.5 | 19.01.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018US14571 | Priority number, date | US201762448280P | 19.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762448280 P | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018136826 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3571065 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/00, B60B7/06, B62D35/00, // B60B27/00 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
B60C23/00305 (EP,US);
B60B27/0047 (EP);
B60B7/066 (EP);
B60C23/00318 (EP,US);
B60C23/00363 (EP,US);
B60C23/008 (EP);
B62D25/166 (EP);
B62D25/188 (EP);
B62D35/001 (EP);
B60C2200/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/48] | B60C23/12, B60C23/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | EXTERN MONTIERTES REIFENAUFBLASSYSTEM | [2019/48] | English: | EXTERNALLY MOUNTED TIRE INFLATION SYSTEM | [2019/48] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GONFLAGE DE PNEU MONTÉ À L'EXTÉRIEUR | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 06.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/41] | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US9327550 (BUTLER JOSHUA [US], et al) [YD] 1,2,13-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2016288590 (HENNIG MARK KEVIN [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,13-21* the whole document * | International search | [X]GB434484 (THOMAS FREDERICK HOLLOWAY) [X] 1-2, 9-12, 81 * Entire document, especially pg 1, In 9-21, 56-73, pg 2, In 17-44 and figs. 1 and 3. *; | [YA]US3954281 (JUERGENS ALFRED R) [Y] 4 * Entire document, especially col 2, In 13 16 and fig. 1 * [A] 5-6; | [A]US2004173296 (WHITE JAY D [US], et al) [A] 1-18, 19/(17-18), 20-22, 81-82* Entire document. *; | [A]US2013199685 (NELSON CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al) [A] 1-18, 19/(17-18), 20-22, 81-82 * Entire document. *; | [A]US2014196812 (MUSGRAVE TIM [US], et al) [A] 1-18, 19/(17-18), 20-22, 81-82 * Entire document. *; | [A]US2014271261 (BOELRYK BARTHOLOMEW J [CA]) [A] 1-18, 19/(17-18), 20-22, 81-82 * Entire document. *; | [XYA]US2016288590 (HENNIG MARK KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 9, 11, 13-18, 19/(17-18), 20-22, 81-82 * Entire document, especially para [0017]-[0018], [0020]-[0022], [0032]-[0034] and figs. 1-2 and 6. * [Y] 4 [A] 5-8 |