EP3571276 - CLEANING COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CLEANING ENGINE COOLING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prestone Products Corporation 69 Eagle Road Danbury, CT 06810 / US | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHEWS, Joseph K. 26 Nutmeg Drive New Milford Connecticut 06776 / US | 02 /
BALOG, David L. 69 Eagle Road Danbury Connecticut 06810 / US | 03 /
KALAGHER, Thomas G. 163 Ascot Lane Torrington Connecticut 06790 / US | 04 /
WOYCIESJES, Peter M. 69 Eagle Road Danbury Connecticut 06810 / US | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 18742219.1 | 19.01.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018US14452 | Priority number, date | US201762448742P | 20.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762448742 P | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018136756 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3571276 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/72, C11D11/00, F01P11/06, F28F19/00 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
C11D3/0073 (EP,US);
C11D3/044 (US);
C11D3/2082 (US);
C11D3/2086 (EP,US);
C11D3/361 (EP,US);
C11D3/362 (US);
F01P11/06 (EP,US);
F28F19/00 (EP,US);
F28G9/00 (US);
C11D2111/20 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0094 (EP,US);
F28F19/01 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/48] | C11D1/72, C11D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON MOTORKÜHLSYSTEMEN | [2019/48] | English: | CLEANING COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CLEANING ENGINE COOLING SYSTEMS | [2019/48] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE NETTOYAGE ET PROCÉDÉS DE NETTOYAGE POUR SYSTÈMES DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE MOTEUR | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 15.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 22.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0028038 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 10, paragraph 4; examples I-G * * page 11, paragraph 3 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US2005245411 (YANG BO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * examples 1-4; claim -; tables 1-8 *; | [A]US2006112972 (PEITERSEN NATHAN D [US], et al) [A] 1-15* formula 4;; table 2 *; | [T] - annonymous, ""phosphate esters"", (20170809), pages 1 - 12, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20170809022343/http://surchem.pl/pl/kosmetyki/pdf/Lieferprogramm_Phosphate%20Esters.pdf, (20210401), XP002802576 [T] 1-15 * pages 2, 5, 6 - page 9 * | International search | [A]US4540443 (BARBER ALAN G [US]) [A] 1-33* ; entire document *; | [Y]US2007259802 (HEINTZ STAVROULA M [US], et al) [Y] 18 * entire document, especially [0034]-[0035], [0052] *; | [XY]US2010184855 (BERNHARDT RANDAL J [US], et al) [X] 22-23, 25 * entire document, especially [0017], [0021], [0037], [0065], [0067]. [0089], [01011-[0102], [0116], [0121], [0129]-[0131], [0140] * [Y] 7-8, 24; | [XY]US2010317559 (RYTHER ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 9-17, 19-21, 26-33 * entire document, especially [0008], [0015], [0017]-[0019], [0021], [0028], [0031]-[0033], [0035], [0040]-[0041], [0046], [0051], [0057]-[0058], [0064]-[0065], [0067] * [Y] 7-8, 18, 24; | [A] - Anonymous, "North America Phosphate Esters Market: By Type (Tri Aryl/Alkyl Aryl Phosphate Esters, Tri Alkyl Phosphate Ester and Bisphosphates); By Application (Lubricants, Surfactants, Pesticides, Fire Retardants, Hydraulic Fluids, Plasticizers, Paints & Coatings, and Others); By Geography (U.S., Canada, and Mexico) - Forecasts till 2020", (20160430), pages 1 - 2, MicroMarket Monitor, URL: http://www.micromarketmonitor.com/market/north-america-phosphate-esters-9779109677.html, (20180420), XP055695120 [A] 1-33 * ; entire document, especially pg 1 para 1, pg 1 para 3 * | [A] - HANNAN, "Technician's Formulation Handbook for Industrial and Household Cleaning Products", Hannan Kyral LLC, (20070819), ISBN 978-0615156019 [A] 1-33 * ; entire document, especially pg 61 para 2-4 * |