EP3658107 - AN SPF BOOSTER FOR USE IN ALCOHOL BASE SUNSCREEN FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Wenjun 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 02 /
ZENG, Fanwen 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 03 /
YEZER, Benjamin 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Liang 1712 Bldg Washington Street Midland, MI 48674 / US | 05 /
SCHMIDT, Dale C. Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | 06 /
SHULMAN, Inna 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | [2020/42] |
Former [2020/23] | 01 /
XU, Wenjun 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | ||
02 /
ZENG, Fanwen 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | |||
03 /
YEZER, Benjamin 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | |||
04 /
CHEN, Liang 1712 Bldg Washington Street Midland, MI 48674 / US | |||
05 /
SCHMIDT, Dale C. 1714 Building Washington Street Midland, MI 48674 / US | |||
06 /
SHULMAN, Inna 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited Corner House 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 18743273.7 | 28.06.2018 | [2020/23] | WO2018US39981 | Priority number, date | US201762538041P | 28.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762538041 P | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019022913 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3658107 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61Q17/04, A61K8/81, A61K8/02 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/0241 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/8117 (EP,US);
A61K8/8147 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
A61K2800/413 (EP,US);
A61K2800/54 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Title | German: | SPF-BOOSTER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN SONNENSCHUTZFORMULIERUNGEN AUF ALKOHOLBASIS | [2020/23] | English: | AN SPF BOOSTER FOR USE IN ALCOHOL BASE SUNSCREEN FORMULATIONS | [2020/23] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR SPF DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS DES FORMULES D'ÉCRAN SOLAIRE À BASE D'ALCOOL | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 25.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 09.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]AU2381099 (ROHM & HAAS) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1092421 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0056] * * example - *; | [A]WO2017058713 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 3 * * example - * * claim - *; | [A]WO2010048124 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 9 - page 4, line 20 * * example - *; | [A]US4427836 (KOWALSKI ALEXANDER [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5663213 |