EP3652494 - ACTIVE MULTI-SPECTRAL SYSTEM FOR GENERATING CAMOUFLAGE OR OTHER RADIATING PATTERNS FROM OBJECTS IN AN INFRARED SCENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451-1449 / US | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAZEMI, Hooman 1063 El Segundo Drive Thousand Oaks, California 91362 / US | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18743274.5 | 28.06.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018US39983 | Priority number, date | US201762531429P | 12.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762531429 P | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019013987 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3652494 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F41H3/00, F41H11/02 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
F41H3/00 (EP,US);
F41H11/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | AKTIVES MULTISPEKTRALES SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON TARNUNG ODER ANDEREN STRAHLUNGSMUSTERN VON OBJEKTEN IN EINER INFRAROTSZENE | [2020/21] | English: | ACTIVE MULTI-SPECTRAL SYSTEM FOR GENERATING CAMOUFLAGE OR OTHER RADIATING PATTERNS FROM OBJECTS IN AN INFRARED SCENE | [2020/21] | French: | SYSTÈME MULTISPECTRAL ACTIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN CAMOUFLAGE OU D'AUTRES MOTIFS RAYONNANTS À PARTIR D'OBJETS DANS UNE SCÈNE INFRAROUGE | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 07.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/16] | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]USH1522H (CAMPILLO ANTHONY J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-18 * column 2, line 30 - line 47; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 6; | [X]US5703314 (MEEKER DELBERT BRENT [US]) [X] 1,4-10,13-18* column 3, line 63; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [XI]US2014355085 (WOIDA-O'BRIEN RIGEL QUINN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-18 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] - [0041]; claim 1 * [I] 6,19,20 |