EP3645101 - GUIDEWIRE ACCESS SLEEVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abiomed, Inc. 22 Cherry Hill Drive Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORKUCH, Christopher Nason Abiomed Inc. 22 Cherry Hill Drive Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18743299.2 | 28.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018US40079 | Priority number, date | US201762525779P | 28.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762525779 P | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019006158 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3645101 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/06, A61M25/09, A61B17/00, A61B90/00 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
A61M25/0662 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M25/09041 (IL,KR,US);
A61M25/0668 (EP,IL,US);
A61M60/148 (IL,KR,US);
A61B2017/00336 (IL,KR,US);
A61B2017/00778 (IL,KR,US);
A61B2090/064 (IL,KR,US);
A61M2025/0681 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M2025/09091 (IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSDRAHTHÜLSE | [2020/19] | English: | GUIDEWIRE ACCESS SLEEVE | [2020/19] | French: | MANCHON D'ACCÈS À UN FIL-GUIDE | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 21.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2033236 (TECHNOLOGICAL SUPPLY); | [A]US6579264 (ROSSI DANIEL [FR]); | [XA]WO2007044907 (FLOWMEDICA INC [US], et al); | [X]US2008015625 (VENTURA CHRISTINE P [US], et al); | [X]WO2011109307 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al); | [XA]WO2017031243 (ABIOMED INC [US]) |