EP3649130 - SERUM STABLE PRO-COELENTERAZINE ANALOGUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promega Corporation 2800 Woods Hollow Road Madison, WI 53711-5399 / US | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Wenhui 3936 Hollyhock Way San Luis Obispo CA 93401 / US | 02 /
BINKOWSKI, Brock E9121 State Road 60 Sauk City WI 53583 / US | 03 /
MEISENHEIMER, Poncho 2868 Victoria Avenue San Luis Obispo CA 93401 / US | 04 /
NILES, Andrew, L. 5716 Richardson Circle Madison WI 53711 / US | 05 /
KUPCHO, Kevin 9 Laramie Court Madison WI 53711 / US | 06 /
UNCH, James 257 Ruth Ann Way Arroyo Grande CA 93420 / US | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2024/21] |
Former [2020/20] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18743348.7 | 29.06.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018US40440 | Priority number, date | US201762529152P | 06.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762529152 P | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019010094 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3649130 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3649130 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C12Q1/66, G01N33/53 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C12Q1/66 (EP,US);
G01N33/582 (US);
G01N21/763 (US);
G01N2333/90241 (US);
G01N2333/916 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SERUMSTABILE PROCOELENTERAZIN-ANALOGA | [2020/20] | English: | SERUM STABLE PRO-COELENTERAZINE ANALOGUES | [2020/20] | French: | ANALOGUES DE PRO-COELENTÉRAZINE STABLES SÉRIQUES | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 03.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO03040100 (PROMEGA CORP [US]); | [YA]US2009075309 (GAMBHIR SANJIV S [US], et al); |