EP3645085 - ACTUATOR AND DEVICE FOR SYNCHRONIZED INJECTION AND ASPIRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states V.V.T. Med Ltd. Beit HaPaAmon 20 HaTaAs Street P.O. Box 211 4442520 Kfar-Saba / IL | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDEIS, Zeev 7 Alon Street 4856039 Rosh HaAyin / IL | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18743596.1 | 25.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018IL50697 | Priority number, date | US201762524668P | 26.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762524668 P | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019003220 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645085 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M5/31 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
A61M5/31511 (EP,US);
A61M1/77 (US);
A61M1/774 (EP,US);
A61M1/81 (EP,US);
A61M3/0279 (EP);
A61M5/19 (EP,US);
A61M5/3148 (EP,US);
A61M5/31581 (EP,US);
A61M1/815 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | AKTUATOR UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SYNCHRONISIERTEN EINSPRITZEN UND ABSAUGEN | [2020/19] | English: | ACTUATOR AND DEVICE FOR SYNCHRONIZED INJECTION AND ASPIRATION | [2020/19] | French: | ACTIONNEUR ET DISPOSITIF POUR INJECTION ET ASPIRATION SYNCHRONISÉES | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 23.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 12.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2020 | 30.06.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.12.2021 | 30.06.2022 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2022 | 30.06.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2023 | 30.06.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6245046 (SIBBITT WILMER L [US]) [A] 1-8* figure 3 *; | [A]WO2006079004 (AVANCA MEDICAL DEVICES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 2, 4, 5 *; | [XAY]US2007016144 (SIBBITT WILMER L JR [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document * [A] 7,8 [Y] 5; | [A]US2010100033 (FOJTIK SHAWN P [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2010106081 (BRANDEIS ZEEV [IL]) [A] 1-8 * figures 2B-3B *; | [XYI]WO2015052704 (VVT MEDICAL LTD [IL]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 5 [I] 4,6 |