EP3576166 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzhou Lekin Semiconductor Co., Ltd. 168 Changsheng North Road Taicang City, Suzhou / CN | [2021/33] |
Former [2019/49] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Keon Hwa 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Su Ik 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Yong Gyeong 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Baek Jun 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Myung Sub 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18744373.4 | 25.01.2018 | [2019/49] | WO2018KR01131 | Priority number, date | KR20170012006 | 25.01.2017 Original published format: KR 20170012006 | KR20170040524 | 30.03.2017 Original published format: KR 20170040524 | KR20170040526 | 30.03.2017 Original published format: KR 20170040526 | [2019/49] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018139877 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576166 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/42, H01S5/042, H01L33/08, H01L33/38, // H01L33/10, H01L33/64, H01S5/024 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
H01L33/08 (EP);
H01L33/60 (US);
H01L33/30 (US);
H01L33/38 (EP);
H01L33/405 (US);
H01S5/04254 (EP);
H01S5/04257 (EP);
H01S5/423 (EP);
H01L33/105 (EP);
H01L33/145 (US);
H01L33/647 (EP);
H01S5/02469 (EP);
H01S5/18305 (EP);
H01S5/18311 (EP);
H01S5/18347 (EP);
H01S5/18388 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/49] | H01L33/22, H01L33/10, H01L33/36, H01L33/62, H01L33/58, H01L27/15, H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2019/49] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2019/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMICONDUCTEUR | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2019 | Translation filed | 20.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 28.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1596441 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0058] ** figures 5A-5C *; | [XI]US2013266326 (JOSEPH JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0042] - [0075] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 15 | International search | [A]JP2006324433 (ROHM CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [15]-[33], and figure 1. *; | [A]US2012223345 (TOMODA KATSUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [33]-[46], claim 1, and figures 2A-2B. *; | [A]KR20160026922 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10* See paragraphs [43]-[64], claim 1, and figures la-lb. *; | [A]KR20160081075 (ILJIN LED CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [19]-[37], and figure 2. *; | [X]KR20160115301 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-10 * See paragraphs [28]-[61], and figures 2-3. * |