EP3580373 - DEVICE FOR SUPPLYING ALUMINA TO AN ELECTROLYTIC CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rio Tinto Alcan International Limited 400-1190, avenue des Canadiens de Montréal Montréal, Québec H3B 0E3 / CA | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENAUDIER, Steeve 13 Rue Jean Moulin 73140 Saint Michel de Maurienne / FR | 02 /
BECASSE, Sébastien 551 Rue Jean-Louis Bouvet 73250 Saint Pierre d'Albigny / FR | 03 /
BRUN, Frédéric Le Coin du Lièvre 73300 Saint Michel de Maurienne / FR | 04 /
COTE, Patrice 1018 Rue du domaine de l'Ile Laterriere, Québec G7N 0B6 / CA | 05 /
FIGUE, Jean-Pierre 7 Rue Lotissement le Crosat 73300 Villargondran / FR | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2022/02] |
Former [2019/51] | Champain, Christophe Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 18745069.7 | 22.01.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018CA50070 | Priority number, date | FR20170000067 | 24.01.2017 Original published format: FR 1700067 | [2019/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018137025 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3580373 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3580373 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 02.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/14, C25C3/22 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
C25C3/14 (EP,DK);
C25C3/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | C25C3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Extension states | BA | 10.07.2019 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUFÜHRUNG VON ALUMINIUMOXID ZU EINER ELEKTROLYTISCHEN ZELLE | [2019/51] | English: | DEVICE FOR SUPPLYING ALUMINA TO AN ELECTROLYTIC CELL | [2019/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN ALUMINE D'UNE CUVE D'ELECTROLYSE | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 12.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2018 | AL | 12.01.2022 | AT | 12.01.2022 | CY | 12.01.2022 | CZ | 12.01.2022 | DK | 12.01.2022 | EE | 12.01.2022 | ES | 12.01.2022 | FI | 12.01.2022 | HR | 12.01.2022 | IT | 12.01.2022 | LT | 12.01.2022 | LV | 12.01.2022 | MC | 12.01.2022 | MK | 12.01.2022 | NL | 12.01.2022 | PL | 12.01.2022 | RS | 12.01.2022 | SE | 12.01.2022 | SK | 12.01.2022 | SM | 12.01.2022 | IE | 22.01.2022 | LU | 22.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | BG | 12.04.2022 | GB | 12.04.2022 | PT | 12.05.2022 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
MK | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 12.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CN102251257 (DEJIN GAO) [X] 1-3,7,17 * abrégé;; figure 10 * [A] 13-16[I] 4-6,8,9,18,19; | [XDAI]CN102628170 (WEI GAO) [XD] 1-3,7,10-12,17 * abrégé;; figures 2, 3 * [A] 13-16 [I] 4-6,8,9,18,19 | International search | [X]WO2011089497 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH], et al) [X] from 1 to 11 and 18 in part *figures 8a and 8b, p. 19,1. 37 à p. 21, 1. 5*; | [X]CN202440556U (WEI GAO) [X] from 1 to 11 and 18 in part *figures 2 and 3 and paragraph [0027]*; | [X]EP2337879 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) [X] from 1 to 11 and 18 in part*figures 5a,5b et 5c, paragraphs [0039]-[0045] * |