EP3575439 - ELECTROLYTIC BATH, ELECTROLYSIS DEVICE, ELECTROLYSIS METHOD, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYDROGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOTTA Shinya c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | 02 /
YOKOTA Masahisa c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | 03 /
FUJIMOTO Norikazu c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | 04 /
KOMURA Ryo c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | 05 /
UCHINO Yousuke c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | 06 /
SUZUKI Yusuke c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 18745271.9 | 26.01.2018 | [2019/49] | WO2018JP02590 | Priority number, date | JP20170012548 | 26.01.2017 Original published format: JP 2017012548 | JP20170012551 | 26.01.2017 Original published format: JP 2017012551 | [2019/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018139616 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3575439 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3575439 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/04 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
C25B15/08 (EP);
C25B1/04 (EP);
C25B13/02 (EP);
C25B9/00 (EP);
C25B9/63 (EP);
C25B9/70 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/14] | C25B9/00, C25B1/10, C25B9/02, C25B9/20, C25B13/02, C25B15/08, C25B9/18 | ||
Former IPC [2019/49] | C25B9/00, C25B1/10, C25B9/02, C25B9/20, C25B13/02, C25B15/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYTISCHES BAD, ELEKTROLYSEVORRICHTUNG, ELEKTROLYSEVERFAHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WASSERSTOFF | [2019/49] | English: | ELECTROLYTIC BATH, ELECTROLYSIS DEVICE, ELECTROLYSIS METHOD, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYDROGEN | [2019/49] | French: | BAIN ÉLECTROLYTIQUE, DISPOSITIF D'ÉLECTROLYSE, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLECTROLYSE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'HYDROGÈNE | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2019 | Translation filed | 24.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 19.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 26.01.2024 | |
IS | 25.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006087987 (ENAGIC CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A] - MILEWSKI, J. ET AL, "Modeling an alkaline electrolysis cell through reduced-order and loss estimate approaches", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (20140707), vol. 269, pages 203 - 211, XP002797813 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2014.06.138 | International search | [YA]JPS5168477 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [Y] 1-8, 11-20 * , page 4, upper right column, line 3 to page 5, lower right column, line 4, fig. 1-3 & GB 1487284 A, page 6, line 65 to page 8, table 4 & DE 2510396 A & FR 2263034 A & SU 878202 A & NL 7502738 A & SE 7502502 A & BR 7501374 A & CA 1088456 A & IT 1034107 B & SE 432447 B * [A] 9, 10; | [Y]WO2013191140 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 6-8, 12-20 * , paragraphs [0143] -[0154], fig. 7 & US 2015/0203976 A1, paragraphs [0178]-[0188], fig. 7 & EP 2862960 A1 & AU 2013278446 A & CN 104364425 A & TW 201406995 A & AU 2016266062 A *; | [YA]JP2014009385 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP) [Y] 1-8, 11-20 * , paragraphs [0025], [0042]-[0044] & CN 203295622 U * [A] 9, 10; | [Y]JP2016094650 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) [Y] 8* , paragraphs [0004]-[0005], fig. 7 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS59173281 | US4530743 | WO2013191140 | WO2014178317 | - DETLEF STOLTEN et al., Hydrogen Energy, in Hydrogen and fuel cells: fundamentals, technologies and applications, Wiley-VCH Verlag GmbH & Co. KGaA, (20100000), pages 254 - 257 |