EP3573664 - ACETAZOLAMIDE OPHTHALMIC SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovative Nano & Micro Technologies Pvt Ltd (INM Technologies) 4 T.M. Industrial Estate 12th KM Mysore Road Bangalore 560059 / IN | For all designated states Shilpa Medicare Limited 12-6-214/A1 Hyderabad Road Raichur, Karnataka 584135 / IN | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARAGANACHARI, Andanayya Innovative Nano&Micro Technologies Pvt Ltd (INM Technologies). 4 T.M. Industrial Estate 12th KM Mysore Road Bangalore 560059 / IN | 02 /
NARANAYASWAMY, Abhilash Innovative Nano&Micro Technologies Pvt Ltd(INM Technologies). 4 T.M. Industrial Estate 12th KM Mysore Road Bangalore 560059 / IN | 03 /
REDDY, Sreenivasa Innovative Nano&Micro Technologies Pvt Ltd(INM Technologies). 4 T.M. Industrial Estate 12th KM Mysore Road Bangalore 560059 / IN | 04 /
SHIVAKUMAR, Pradeep Shilpa Medicare Limited R&D unit Survey No. 207 Modavalasa Village, Denkada Mandal Vizianagaram 523315 / IN | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Lecca, Patricia S. Cabinet Lecca 21, rue de Fécamp 75012 Paris / FR | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 18745444.2 | 22.01.2018 | [2019/49] | WO2018IB50371 | Priority number, date | IN201741003106 | 27.01.2017 Original published format: IN201741003106 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018138621 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573664 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 02.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/40, A61K31/433, A61K9/08, A61P27/02, A61P27/06, A61K47/32, A61K9/00 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
A61K9/0048 (EP);
A61K31/433 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61K47/40 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP,US);
A61P27/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/49] | A61K47/40, A61K31/00, A61K31/41, A61K31/433, A61K9/08, A61P27/02, A61P27/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Title | German: | ACETAZOLAMIDHALTIGE OPHTHALMISCHE LÖSUNG | [2019/49] | English: | ACETAZOLAMIDE OPHTHALMIC SOLUTION | [2019/49] | French: | SOLUTION OPHTALMIQUE À BASE D'ACÉTAZOLAMIDE | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 28.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/52] | 23.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5221722 (SEHM EUGENE J [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 35 - line 56 * | [Y] - Indu Kaur ET AL, "Development of Topically Effective Formulations of Acetazolamide Using HP-[beta]-CD-Polymer Co-Complexes", Current Drug Delivery, United Arab Emirates, doi:10.2174/1567201043480054, (20040101), pages 65 - 72, URL: https://www.eurekaselect.com/63043/article, XP055733691 [Y] 1-10 * page 65 - page 66; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1567201043480054 | [Y] - INDU PAL KAUR ET AL, "Penetration Enhancers and Ocular Bioadhesives: Two New Avenues for Ophthalmic Drug Delivery", DRUG DEVELOPMENT AND INDUSTRIAL PHARMACY, (20020101), vol. 28, no. 4, doi:10.1081/DDC-120002997, pages 353 - 369, XP055484424 [Y] 1-10 * page 362 - page 364 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/DDC-120002997 | International search | [X]US7893040 (LOFTSSON THORSTEINN [IS], et al) [X] 1-10 * . col. 4, line 65- col. 6, line 14; col. 16, line 39-54; claims. * |