EP3652462 - ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING A CABLE CLAMP AND AT LEAST ONE CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-ges. zur Förderung der Angewandten Forschung E.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUS, Roman Niddaweg 7 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | [2020/29] |
Former [2020/21] | 01 /
KRAUS, Roman c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Betriebsfestigkeit und Systemzuverlässigkeit Bartningstrasse 47 64289 Darmstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Rösler, Uwe Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18745839.3 | 09.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018EP68519 | Priority number, date | DE201710211724 | 10.07.2017 Original published format: DE102017211724 | [2020/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019011847 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3652462 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16G11/10, F16G11/14, A43C1/00, A43C7/00 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
F16G11/103 (EP,US);
F16G11/14 (EP,US);
A43C1/02 (EP);
A43C7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG MIT EINER SEILKLEMME UND WENIGSTENS EINEM SEIL | [2020/21] | English: | ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING A CABLE CLAMP AND AT LEAST ONE CABLE | [2020/21] | French: | SYSTÈME COMPRENANT UN SERRE-CORDON ET AU MOINS UN CORDON | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 14.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/35] | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1778954 (MISLIN KARL J) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XA]WO9847401 (CHEN CHUNG CHIN [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [A] 7-12; | [YA]GB2427413 (WALKER STEPHEN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-7,9-11 * the whole document * [A] 12; | [XA]US2008208252 (HOLMES GEORGE B [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * paragraph [0050] * [A] 7-12; | [Y]FR3018573 (URBAN ASSOCIES ARCHITECTES [FR]) [Y] 1-7,9-11 * abstract * * pages 3-7 * | by applicant | FR1450821 | DE6931658U | DE6941149U | NL7700029 | FR2445462 | GB2042047 | GB2147937 | US4787660 | US4896403 | US5697128 | US5766700 | DE29705188U | US5791022 | US5896623 | EP1029466 | EP0775845 | DE19906120 | US6389659 | US6389655 | DE20209943U | US2004194259 | FR2855227 | FR2878925 | US7076845 | EP2101081 | GR20100100420 | US2016108989 | US2017108081 |