EP3625633 - AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE COLLISION MITIGATION SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UATC, LLC 280 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/41] |
Former [2020/13] | For all designated states UATC, LLC 1455 Market Street 4th Floor San Francisco CA 94103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOOD, Matthew Shaw c/o UATC, LLC 280 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
LEACH, William M. c/o UATC, LLC 280 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
POEPPEL, Scott C. c/o UATC, LLC 280 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
LETWIN, Nicholas G. c/o UATC, LLC 280 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 05 /
ZYCH, Noah c/o UATC, LLC 280 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/41] |
Former [2020/13] | 01 /
WOOD, Matthew Shaw c/o UATC, LLC 1455 Market Street 4th Floor San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | ||
02 /
LEACH, William M. c/o UATC, LLC 1455 Market Street 4th Floor San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | |||
03 /
POEPPEL, Scott C. c/o UATC, LLC 1455 Market Street 4th Floor San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | |||
04 /
LETWIN, Nicholas G. c/o UATC, LLC 1455 Market Street 4th Floor San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | |||
05 /
ZYCH, Noah c/o UATC, LLC 1455 Market Street 4th Floor San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [2022/47] |
Former [2020/13] | Black, Diego Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18746049.8 | 22.06.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018US38996 | Priority number, date | US201715637539 | 29.06.2017 Original published format: US201715637539 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019005610 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3625633 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3625633 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, B60W30/09, B62D15/02, G01S17/00, B60W60/00, G01S13/931, G01S15/931, G01S17/931 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
B62D15/0265 (EP,US);
G05D1/0297 (US);
B60W30/09 (EP,US);
B60W60/001 (EP);
B60W60/00276 (US);
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S15/931 (EP,US);
G01S17/931 (EP,US);
G05D1/021 (US);
G05D1/0214 (US);
G05D1/0257 (EP,US);
G05D1/0287 (US);
B60W2420/403 (US);
B60W2420/408 (US);
B60W2554/00 (EP);
B60W2554/4026 (US);
B60W2554/4029 (US);
B60W2554/4041 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/13] | G05D1/02, B60W30/09, B62D15/02, G01S17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTONOMEN FAHRZEUGKOLLISIONSMINDERUNG | [2022/23] | English: | AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE COLLISION MITIGATION SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2020/13] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR ATTÉNUATION DE COLLISION DE VÉHICULE AUTONOME | [2022/23] |
Former [2020/13] | KOLLISIONSMINDERUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN FÜR AUTONOMES FAHRZEUG | ||
Former [2020/13] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ANTI-COLLISION POUR VÉHICULE AUTONOME | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 19.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.06.2022 | 18.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.11.2022 | AT | 23.11.2022 | CZ | 23.11.2022 | DK | 23.11.2022 | EE | 23.11.2022 | ES | 23.11.2022 | FI | 23.11.2022 | HR | 23.11.2022 | IT | 23.11.2022 | LT | 23.11.2022 | LV | 23.11.2022 | MC | 23.11.2022 | NL | 23.11.2022 | PL | 23.11.2022 | RO | 23.11.2022 | RS | 23.11.2022 | SE | 23.11.2022 | SI | 23.11.2022 | SK | 23.11.2022 | SM | 23.11.2022 | NO | 23.02.2023 | GR | 24.02.2023 | IS | 23.03.2023 | PT | 23.03.2023 | GB | 22.06.2023 | IE | 22.06.2023 | LU | 22.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | FR | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
GB | 22.06.2023 | ||
IE | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 22.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
FR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
IE | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 23.11.2022 | |
NO | 23.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003083818 (TOJIMA MASANORI [JP]) [X] 1-20* Paragraphs [0002], [0004], [0007]-[0012], [0025], [0064], [0066], [0069], [0092], [0096]-[0098], [0108]; Figures 1, 3(a), 3(b), 11(a)-11(c). *; | [X]US2007219720 (TREPAGNIER PAUL G [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * Paragraphs [0002], [0043], [0044], [0070], [0073], [0100], [0102], [0105], [0106], [0112], [0145]; Figures 1A, 2, 6B, 10. *; | [X]US8855849 (FERGUSON DAVID I [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * Column 1 lines 10-15, 25-27, column 6 lines 66-67, column 7 lines 1-20, column 10 lines 50-67, column 11 lines 1-61, column 12 lines 5-19, column 15 lines 25-43, Figures 1, 2, 3A-3C, 4B. * | Examination | WO2016122744 |