EP3808015 - LINK-ADAPTATION FOR PASSIVE INTERMODULATION AVOIDANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2024/13] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANN, Karl 13 Bourne Street Ottawa, Ontario K2J 3C4 / CA | 02 /
ABOU-ZEID, Hatem 508 - 315 Holmwood Ave Ottawa, Ontario K1S 2R2 / CA | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/13] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2021/16] | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18746993.7 | 15.06.2018 | [2021/16] | WO2018IB54435 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019239196 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3808015 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3808015 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0015 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
Y02D30/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LINK-ADAPTION ZUR VERMEIDUNG VON PASSIVER INTERMODULATION | [2021/16] | English: | LINK-ADAPTATION FOR PASSIVE INTERMODULATION AVOIDANCE | [2021/16] | French: | ADAPTATION DE LIAISON POUR ÉVITEMENT D'INTERMODULATION PASSIVE | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 17.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 27.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013242939 (WAGNER ELMAR [DE]) [A] 1-52 * abstract ** paragraphs [0071] , [0 85] , [0 86] *; | [I]US2015139009 (PARK HANJUN [KR], et al) [I] 1-52 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0016] - [0 59] - [0063]; claim 1 *; | [XI]WO2017093784 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [X] 1-4,11-20,27-36,41-46,51,52 * abstract * * page 10, line 20 - page 22 * * page 15, line 14 - line 22 * * page 19, line 1 - line 19 * * page 2, line 25 - line 27 * * page 17, line 24 - line 30 * [I] 5-10,21-26,37-40,47-50 | Examination | US2019052381 | by applicant | US9432131 |