EP3578374 - POWDER FILM FORMING METHOD AND POWDER FILM FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Zosen Corporation 7-89, Nanko-kita 1-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 559-8559 / JP | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIURA, Sousuke c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION 7-89 Nanko-Kita1-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP | 02 /
SUGIYO, Takeshi c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION 7-89 Nanko-Kita1-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP | 03 /
FUKUI, Hideyuki c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION 7-89 Nanko-Kita1-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18747116.4 | 05.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018JP03840 | Priority number, date | JP20170019085 | 03.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017019085 | JP20170019089 | 03.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017019089 | JP20170019093 | 03.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017019093 | [2019/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018143459 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3578374 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3578374 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B41M1/42, B41F15/08, B05C19/04, B05D1/06, B05D7/24, B41M1/12, B05D3/12, B41F15/36, B41F15/40, // B41M1/22 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
B05D1/06 (EP,KR,US);
B41M1/42 (EP,KR);
B05B5/0255 (US);
B05C19/04 (EP,KR,US);
B05D3/12 (EP,US);
B05D7/24 (KR);
B41F15/08 (EP,KR);
B41F15/36 (EP);
B41F15/40 (EP);
B41F15/405 (US);
B41M1/125 (EP,KR);
B41M1/22 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | B41M1/42, B41F15/08, B05C19/04, B05D1/06, B05D7/24, B41M1/12, // B41M1/22 | ||
Former IPC [2019/50] | B41M1/42, B41F15/08, B05C19/04, B05D1/06, B05D7/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PULVERFILMEN | [2019/50] | English: | POWDER FILM FORMING METHOD AND POWDER FILM FORMING DEVICE | [2019/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN FILM DE POUDRE ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'UN FILM DE POUDRE | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2019 | Translation filed | 19.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 29.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3285168 (CHILDRESS CLYDE O) [X] 1,2,4,9 * the whole document * * especially column 1 line 26 to column 4 line 42 and figures 1-5 * [I] 3,5-8,10,11; | [XI]US3450043 (FLAX JEROME) [X] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document * * especially column 2 line 40 to column 4 line 11 and figures 1-6 *[I] 3-7,10,11 | International search | [A]US3081698 (CHILDRESS CLYDE O, et al) [A] 1-15* , & GB 919919 A & DE 1203808 B & FR 1282489 A & BE 600948 A & CH 382195 A & CH 395913 A & CH 431275 A *; | [Y]JPS57107270 (TSUJIURA MICHIO) [Y] 4-5, 11 * , 1 1 *; | [XY]JP2010207780 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-2, 6, 8-9, 15 * , [0 0 0 1] - [0 0 5 1], & WO 2010/103938 A1 & US 2011/0318500 A1,[0002]-[0062] & KR 10-2011-0114659 A & CN 102348511 A * [Y] 4-5, 10-11, 13; | [XY]JP2010207779 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1, 3, 7-8, 12, 14-15 * , [0 0 0 1] - [0 0 5 2], * [Y] 10-11, 13 | by applicant | JP2012140016 | JP2012179786 |