EP3577162 - POLYMERIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2100 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | [2023/48] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCENEANY, Ryan J. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 02 /
GALABURA, Yuriy 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 03 /
CARRILLO OJEDA, Antonio J. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 04 /
SCHOLL, Neil T. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 05 /
TOPOLKARAEV, Vasily A. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 06 /
HALL, David W. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 07 /
KEMPPINEN, Juha P. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 08 /
LORTSCHER, Peter S. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 09 /
ESLINGER, Lori A. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 10 /
THOMPSON, Brent M. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 11 /
WIDEMAN, Gregory J. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | [2023/27] |
Former [2019/50] | 01 /
MCENEANY, Ryan, J. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
02 /
GALABURA, Yuriy 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | |||
03 /
CARRILLO OJEDA, Antonio J. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | |||
04 /
SCHOLL, Neil, T. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | |||
05 /
TOPOLKARAEV, Vasily, A. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | |||
06 /
HALL, David W. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | |||
07 /
KEMPPINEN, Juha P. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | |||
08 /
LORTSCHER, Peter, S. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | |||
09 /
ESLINGER, Lori A. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | |||
10 /
THOMPSON, Brent M. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | |||
11 /
WIDEMAN, Gregory, J. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18747775.7 | 19.01.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018US14404 | Priority number, date | US201762452585P | 31.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762452585 P | US201762464582P | 28.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762464582 P | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144242 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3577162 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3577162 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, C08L83/04, C08L67/02, C08L23/06, C08L23/12, D01F8/16, D04H3/005, D04H1/00, A61F13/51, C08L67/00, D01D5/247, D01F1/08, D01F1/10, D01F6/62, D01F6/92, D01F8/06, D01F8/14, D04H1/42 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
A61F13/51 (EP);
C08J9/0061 (KR,US);
A61F13/531 (US);
A61L15/225 (US);
A61L15/425 (US);
B82Y30/00 (RU);
C08J9/00 (RU);
C08L23/06 (KR,RU);
C08L23/12 (EP,KR,RU);
C08L67/00 (EP);
C08L67/02 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR,RU);
D01D5/247 (EP,US);
D01F1/08 (EP);
D01F1/10 (EP,US);
D01F6/62 (EP,US);
D01F6/92 (EP,US);
D01F8/06 (EP,US);
D01F8/14 (EP,US);
D01F8/16 (KR,RU,US);
D04H1/00 (KR,RU);
D04H1/42 (EP);
D04H3/005 (EP,KR,RU);
A61F2013/51026 (EP);
A61F2013/530233 (US);
C08J2367/02 (US);
C08J2423/06 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/12, C08L83/04 (EP);
C08L67/02, C08L83/04 (EP) |
Former IPC [2019/50] | C08J9/00, C08L83/04, C08L67/02, C08L23/06, C08L23/12, D01F8/16, D04H3/005, D04H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERMATERIAL | [2019/50] | English: | POLYMERIC MATERIAL | [2019/50] | French: | MATÉRIAU POLYMÈRE | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 03.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1550746 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-15* claims 1-47 *; | [X]US2015025197 (GAROIS NICOLAS [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,8 * claim 1 *; | [XA]WO2016085711 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1,2,6-14 * figure 1; claims 1-33 * * page 1, lines 3-17 * * page 1, lines 19-29 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 26 * [A] 3-5,15 | International search | [Y]US4640962 (OSTROZYNSKI ROBERT L [US], et al) [Y] 1-27 * See columns 2, 3. *; | [A]US6433243 (WOLTMAN GARRY ROLAND [US], et al) [A] 1-27* See the whole document. *; | [A]WO2007141745 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * See the whole document. *; | [Y]WO2008021673 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) [Y] 1-20, 24-26 * See abstract and claims 1, 10, 11 *; | [Y]US2016101208 (TOPOLKARAEV VASILY A [US], et al) [Y] 1-27 * See paragraphs [0002], [0021], [0022], [0025], [0030], [0032], [0048], [0054], [0055], [0074], [0082], [0083], [0093], [0103]; and claims 43, 47, 49 , 54, 56, 62, 70. *; | [Y]US2016108564 (TOPOLKARAEV VASILY A [US], et al) [Y] 1-27 * See paragraphs [0018], [0032], [0078], [0099], [0100]; and claims 38, 44-46, 53. * | by applicant | US315990 | US358035 | US384508 | US384819 | US390708 | US418305 | US428267 | US3423255 | US3802817 | US3855046 | US4704116 | US4798603 | US5192606 | US5248309 | US5486166 | US5490846 | US5620779 | US5702377 | US5931823 | US5962112 | US6060638 | US6072012 | US6093665 | US6150002 | US6642429 | US6663611 | US2004102750 | US2005054255 | US2005059941 | EP1550746 | US2015025197 | WO2016085711 |