EP3577459 - METHODS FOR MEASURING SMALL MOLECULE AFFINITY TO CEREBLON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celgene Corporation Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [2024/14] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states Celgene Corporation 86 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ 07901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMBERLAIN, Philip Paul 2829 Brant Street San Diego CA 92103 / US | 02 /
MATYSKIELA, Mary 12791 Calle De La Siena San Diego CA 92130 / US | 03 /
KHAMBATTA, Godrej 6106 Via Regla San Diego CA 92122 / US | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18748010.8 | 02.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018US16609 | Priority number, date | US201762454654P | 03.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762454654 P | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144832 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3577459 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, C07K16/18, C12Q1/68, G01N33/542 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/542 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
G01N2333/4703 (EP,US);
G01N2500/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | G01N33/50, C07K16/18, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER AFFINITÄT KLEINER MOLEKÜLE GEGENÜBER CEREBLON | [2019/50] | English: | METHODS FOR MEASURING SMALL MOLECULE AFFINITY TO CEREBLON | [2019/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE MESURE DE L'AFFINITÉ DE PETITES MOLÉCULES POUR LE CÉRÉBLON | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 10.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010285503 (BRADSHAW JAMES MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]EP2757379 (MAX PLANCK GES ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER WISSENSCHAFTEN E V [DE]); | by applicant | WO9318186 | US8518972 |