EP3578615 - COATING FOR FORMING INFRARED SHIELDING FILM, INFRARED SHIELDING FILM-EQUIPPED TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2023/26] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGANO, Satoko c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corporation Central Research Institute 1002-14 Mukohyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | 02 /
YAMASAKI, Kazuhiko c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corporation Central Research Institute 1002-14 Mukohyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | [2023/26] |
Former [2019/50] | 01 /
HIGANO, Satoko c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Central Research Institute 1002-14 Mukohyama Naka-shi Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMASAKI, Kazuhiko c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Central Research Institute 1002-14 Mukohyama Naka-shi Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/26] |
Former [2019/50] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18748324.3 | 29.01.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018JP02781 | Priority number, date | JP20170018351 | 03.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017018351 | [2019/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018143131 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3578615 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3578615 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09D163/00, B05D7/24, B32B27/20, B32B27/38, C03C17/30, C09D5/33, C09D7/40, C09D183/04 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
C09D163/00 (EP,KR);
C09D5/32 (US);
B05D7/24 (EP,KR);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/38 (EP,US);
C03C17/30 (EP,US);
C03C17/32 (EP);
C03C17/326 (US);
C08K3/20 (KR);
C08L63/00 (KR);
C09D1/00 (KR);
C09D183/04 (EP);
C09D5/00 (KR);
C09D7/40 (EP);
C09D7/61 (KR);
C09D7/65 (KR);
C09D7/67 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C09D163/00, C08K3/22, C08K3/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES INFRAROTSCHUTZFILMS, MIT INFRAROTSCHUTZFILM AUSGESTATTETES TRANSPARENTES SUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/50] | English: | COATING FOR FORMING INFRARED SHIELDING FILM, INFRARED SHIELDING FILM-EQUIPPED TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2019/50] | French: | REVÊTEMENT POUR FORMER UN FILM DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES INFRAROUGES, SUBSTRAT TRANSPARENT ÉQUIPÉ D'UN FILM DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES INFRAROUGES ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA PRODUCTION | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2019 | Translation filed | 11.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 01.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2023 | CZ | 28.06.2023 | DK | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | IT | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | MC | 28.06.2023 | NL | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SI | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | LU | 29.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SI | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SI | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1816109 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP2578650 (RIKEN TECHNOS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0193]; claim 1 * * paragraph [0900] ** claim 1 *; | [A] - LUO Y. ET AL, "PREPARATION AND OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF NOVEL TRANSPARENT AL-DOPED ZNO/EPOXY NANOCOMPOSITES", J. PHYS CHEM C, (2009), vol. 113, XP002800204 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp901501z | International search | [A]JP2012087168 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-3 * , claims, paragraphs [0013]-[0017], [0024], [0028], [0050]-[0066], example 16 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015212220 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-3* , paragraphs [0018]-[0029], [0071]-[0117], [0124]-[0135], [0165]-[0206], examples 1-8 & US 2014/0023860 A1, paragraphs [0033]-[0046], [0091]-[0141], [0151]-[0163], [0205]-[0264], examples 1-8 & EP 2690145 A1 & CN 103443224 A & KR 10-2014-0009383 A * | by applicant | JP2005194169 | JP2008024577 | JP2017018351 |