EP3577886 - DETECTION AND PREVENTION OF UNWANTED CALLS IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Communications (America) Inc. 11911 Freedom Drive Suite 250 Reston VA 20190 / US | [2024/15] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states Tata Communications (America) Inc. 2355 Dulles Corner Boulevard 7th Floor Herndon, VA 20171 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENLOLO, Robert 5612 Wentworth Avenue Cote-saint-luc Quebec H4W 2R9 / CA | 02 /
MIRANDA, Carlos 720 Sw 14th Street Deerfield Beech FL 33441 / US | 03 /
TAI, Alan 29 Woodpecker Way Marlboro NJ 07746 / US | 04 /
THIRUMALAIAPPAN, Kumar 2310 Rivendell Way Edison NJ 08817 / US | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18748345.8 | 01.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018US16470 | Priority number, date | US201762454522P | 03.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762454522 P | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144745 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3577886 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3577886 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/436, H04M3/42 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
H04M3/436 (EP,US);
H04M3/42059 (EP,US);
H04M3/42102 (EP,US);
H04M2203/556 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | H04M3/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG UND PRÄVENTION UNERWÜNSCHTER ANRUFE IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2019/50] | English: | DETECTION AND PREVENTION OF UNWANTED CALLS IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2019/50] | French: | DÉTECTION ET PRÉVENTION D'APPELS INDÉSIRABLES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 30.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | MC | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
DK | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/12] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013336169 (TAI ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,11,12,16-18 * paragraphs [0024] - [0041]; figure 1 * [I] 3-5,9,10,13-15,19,20; | [XI]US2015086001 (FARRAND TOBY [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0040] , [0041] , [0058]; figure 3 *[I] 2-10,12-20 | International search | [A]US2005053215 (BEDINGFIELD JAMES C SR [US]) [A] 1-32 * , entire document *; | [A]US2005182745 (DHILLON JASJIT S [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * , entire document *; | [A]US2009282094 (HAWKINS JOHNNY [US]) [A] 1-32 * , entire document, especially; abstract, para. [0004], [0017], [0022], [0037] *; | [A]US2016309024 (QUILICI ALEXANDER E [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * , entire document, especially; abstract, para. [0037], Fig. 1 *; | [XP]US9729727 (ZHANG SHUPING [US]) [XP] 1, 11, 17, 27* , entire document, especially; abstract * | by applicant | US2013336169 | US2015086001 |