EP3578156 - CERAMIC LIFTING AND LOWERING DEVICE FOR THERMOTHERAPEUTIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceragem Co., Ltd. 10 Jeongja 1-gil Seonggeo-eup Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si, Chungcheongnam-do 31045 / KR | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Sang Cheol (Ssangyong Xi Apt. Ssangyong-dong) 110-803 15 Wolbong 1-gil, Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do 31179 / KR | 02 /
HONG, Seung Gwan (Bumyang Mothervill 1cha Apt. Ssangyong-dong) 101-1006 170-5 Chungmu-ro, Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do 31175 / KR | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18748549.5 | 18.01.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018KR00854 | Priority number, date | KR20170014567 | 01.02.2017 Original published format: KR 20170014567 | [2019/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018143586 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3578156 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61H39/06, A61F7/00, A61H15/02 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
A61F7/007 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61H39/06 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61H15/0078 (EP,CN,US);
A61H15/00 (EP,US);
A61H15/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61H2015/0014 (CN);
A61H2015/0021 (EP,US);
A61H2015/0028 (US);
A61H2201/0142 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0146 (US);
A61H2201/0149 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0196 (EP);
A61H2201/0207 (EP,CN,US);
A61H2201/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61H2201/1207 (CN);
A61H2201/1215 (EP,US);
A61H2201/14 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1669 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1671 (EP);
A61H2201/1676 (EP);
A61H2201/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | KERAMISCHE HEBE- UND SENKUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE THERMOTHERAPEUTISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/50] | English: | CERAMIC LIFTING AND LOWERING DEVICE FOR THERMOTHERAPEUTIC APPARATUS | [2019/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE ET D'ABAISSEMENT DE CÉRAMIQUE DESTINÉ À UN APPAREIL THERMOTHÉRAPEUTIQUE | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2019 | Translation filed | 29.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 26.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH06125951 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 4,7,8 * paragraphs [0032] - [0040]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]JP2009000278 (FUJI IRYOKI KK) [Y] 4,7,8* paragraphs [0040] , [0041]; figure -; claim - *; | [XY]EP2638889 (CERAGEM CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figures 1-8; claim - * [Y] 4,7,8; | [X]CN103860315 (CERAGEM CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0056] - [0059] - [0092] - [0094]; figures 1-8; claim - *; | [X]WO2015083967 (CERAGEM CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-4; claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO2016039563 (CERAGEM CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]KR200311358Y [A] 1-8; | [XA]KR101181918B [X] 1, 2 [A] 3-8; | [A]KR20120122420 [A] 1-8; | [A]KR20120128026 [A] 1-8; | [A]KR101528980B [A] 1-8 |