EP3576572 - COLLAPSIBLE CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graybill, Robert Steven 152 Cape May Lane Mount Pleasant, North Carolina 29464 / US | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2023/23] |
Former [2019/50] | Heinze, Ekkehard Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18748634.5 | 05.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018US16923 | Priority number, date | US201762454112P | 03.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762454112 P | US201762535709P | 21.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762535709 P | US201862620305P | 22.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862620305 P | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018145039 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576572 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3576572 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47C4/28, A47C4/00, A47C4/02, A47C5/10, A45B5/00 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
A47C4/286 (EP,KR,US);
A45B5/00 (EP);
A47C13/00 (EP,KR,US);
A47C4/02 (EP,KR,US);
A45F2004/026 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | A47C4/28, A47C4/00, A47C4/02, A47C5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLAPPSTUHL | [2019/50] | English: | COLLAPSIBLE CHAIR | [2019/50] | French: | CHAISE PLIANTE | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 19.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4786082 (SWIETLIK DANIEL A [US]) [A] 1,9,13* column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 21; figures 1-7 *; | [A]CN202874555U (JIN XINGFANG) [A] 1,9,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014375104 (KIM HYUN-GIL [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]US4258951 (GROOM SIMEON H) [A] 1-20 * Entire document *; | [A]US5054849 (HOFF RICHARD [US]) [A] 1-20 * Entire document *; | [A]US2007252416 (PARK FREDERICK K [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * Entire document *; | [A]US2012104805 (LAH JEH-KUN [KR]) [A] 1-20 * Entire document especially Fig. 2, 7; para [0044]-[0045], [0055] *; | [A]US2015313330 (STEVENS SUE [US], et al) [A] 1-20* Entire document *; | [A]US2015374131 (KIM HYUN-GIL [KR]) [A] 1-20 * Entire document * |