EP3662164 - IMPELLER FOR WASTEWATER PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRINGER, Peer c/o KSB SE&Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18750116.8 | 24.07.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018EP70025 | Priority number, date | DE201710213507 | 03.08.2017 Original published format: DE102017213507 | [2020/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019025238 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3662164 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F04D7/04, F04D13/08, F04D29/24, F04D29/22 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
F04D7/04 (EP,US);
F04D29/24 (US);
F04D13/08 (EP);
F04D29/225 (EP);
F04D29/2294 (EP);
F04D29/245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | LAUFRAD FÜR ABWASSERPUMPE | [2020/24] | English: | IMPELLER FOR WASTEWATER PUMP | [2020/24] | French: | ROUE MOBILE POUR POMPE À EAUX USÉES | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 22.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE2855385 (STAEHLE MARTIN) [X] 1-3,5,8 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * [I] 4; | [XI]EP0114932 (STAEHLE MARTIN) [X] 1-3,5,8 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 * * page 2, paragraphs 4,5 * * page 3, paragraph 1 * [I] 4; | [XI]EP0874161 (KSB AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * column 1, lines 19-23; figures 1,2 * [I] 4; | [XI]DE102011007907 (KSB AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8 * paragraph [0011]; figure 2a *[I] 4; | [XI]WO2015000677 (SULZER PUMPEN AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,6,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0014] , [0033]; figures 1,2 * [I] 4 | by applicant | DE4015331 |