EP3827147 - BASIC UNIT, INFRASTRUCTURE FACILITY AND INFRASTRUCTURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maurus, Tobias Hasenbergsteige 76 70197 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/22] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 18750359.4 | 23.07.2018 | [2021/22] | WO2018EP69954 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020020435 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3827147 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04H1/12, E04H6/02, B60L53/30, B60L53/51 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
E04H1/1233 (EP,US);
B60L53/30 (EP,US);
E04B1/24 (US);
E04D13/08 (US);
E04H6/025 (EP,US);
E04B2001/249 (US);
E04D2013/0893 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Title | German: | BASISEINHEIT, INFRASTRUKTUREINRICHTUNG UND INFRASTRUKTURSYSTEM | [2021/22] | English: | BASIC UNIT, INFRASTRUCTURE FACILITY AND INFRASTRUCTURE SYSTEM | [2021/22] | French: | UNITÉ DE BASE, DISPOSITIF D'INFRASTRUCTURE ET SYSTÈME D'INFRASTRUCTURE | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 23.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2022 | 31.07.2022 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2023 | 31.07.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2024 | 31.07.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2012110502 (BOETTLE STEFAN [DE], et al) [Y] 2,5,7-11 * figures 1-10 *; | [XY]EP2594707 (SOLPERIS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] - [0 51] , [0 56]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,33,34; | [XAYI]WO2016026513 (MAURUS TOBIAS [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,16-18,21,28,30,35-37,39,41-46,48-52,54,55 * the whole document * [A] 12-15,19,20,47 [Y] 2,5,7-11,23-27,33,34 [I] 22,29,31,32,38,40,53; | [Y]WO2016118988 (ICONIC PRODUCT GMBH [AT]) [Y] 2,23-27* figures 1-6 * |