EP3580118 - SHOCK TOWER FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna International Inc. 337 Magna Drive Aurora, ON L4G 7K1 / CA | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEB, Charles, Peckitt 2721 West Utica Road Shelby Township, MI 48317 / US | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 18750691.0 | 06.02.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018US17047 | Priority number, date | US201762455684P | 07.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762455684 P | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018148200 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3580118 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3580118 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/08, B62D27/02, F16F9/32 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
B62D25/088 (EP,US);
F16F9/3271 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | B62D25/08, B62D27/02, F16F9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STOSSDÄMPFERBRÜCKE FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2019/51] | English: | SHOCK TOWER FOR A VEHICLE | [2019/51] | French: | DÔME DE SUSPENSION POUR VÉHICULE | [2023/40] |
Former [2019/51] | TOUR PARE-CHOCS DE VÉHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 17.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2967965 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]); | [XI]EP2955084 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [XI]US2016355064 (AMEMIYA KOJI [JP]) | International search | [A]US5456517 (KALIAN ARIANNA [US], et al); | [A]US2012242111 (MILDNER UDO [DE], et al); | [A]US2016264176 (BALZER JASON SCOTT [US], et al); | [Y]WO2016146293 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al); | [XYA]US2016355064 (AMEMIYA KOJI [JP]) | by applicant | FR2967965 | EP2955084 | US2016026416 | US2016355064 |