EP3582106 - CASH PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glory Ltd. 3-1, Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKA, Naoki c/o GLORY LTD. 3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | 02 /
WAKABAYASHI, Nobumichi c/o Hokuto System Inc. 1930-1 Mizuashi Noguchi-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo 675-0019 / JP | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 18751222.3 | 12.01.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018JP00672 | Priority number, date | JP20170021169 | 08.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017021169 | [2019/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018146998 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3582106 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/54, G06F13/00 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
G07F19/211 (EP,US);
G06Q20/1085 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3223 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | BARGELDVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/51] | English: | CASH PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2019/51] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'ESPÈCES | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2019 | Translation filed | 06.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 21.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005109832 (IZAWA SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0112] *[I] 2-7 | International search | [Y]JP2003208520 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 3 * , abstract (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2005157425 (FUJITSU LTD, et al) [X] 1-2, 6-7 * , abstract, paragraphs [0002]-[0028], [0036], [0042]-[0046], [0056]-[0060], fig. 3 & US 2005/0109832 A1, abstract, paragraphs [0002]-[0031], [0077], [0083]-[0087], [0098]-[0102], fig. 3 * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]JP2005157426 (FUJITSU LTD, et al) [Y] 4-5* , paragraphs [0050], [0093]-[0104] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2008293152 | JP5497282B | JP2015222557 | JP2017021169 |