EP3570591 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING IMPROVED COMMUNICATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Soenghun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 02 /
JANG, Jaehyuk 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Sangbum 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 04 /
JIN, Seungri 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 05 /
VAN DER VELDE, Himke Mr. P. J. Oudlaan 18 8014 ZT Zwolle / NL | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 18751355.1 | 26.01.2018 | [2019/47] | WO2018KR01173 | Priority number, date | KR20170019575 | 13.02.2017 Original published format: KR 20170019575 | [2019/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018147582 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570591 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/12, // H04W36/08 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP);
H04W36/0005 (KR,US);
H04W76/27 (CN,KR);
H04W36/00 (EP);
H04W36/02 (EP,KR);
H04W36/14 (CN);
H04W36/36 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W76/28 (CN);
H04W8/18 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2019/47] | H04W36/00, H04W36/02, H04W36/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON VERBESSERTER KOMMUNIKATION IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2019/47] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING IMPROVED COMMUNICATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2019/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉALISATION D'UNE COMMUNICATION AMÉLIORÉE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2019 | Translation filed | 13.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 21.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1190582 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [XI]US2016165638 (OZTURK OZCAN [US], et al); | International search | [A]WO2008040447 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]US2009253422 (FISCHER PATRICK [FR]); | [A]KR20140022711 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20150139825 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]US2016269956 (SAWHNEY SALIL [US], et al) |