EP3658829 - REFRIGERANT COMPOSITION MEASUREMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Tyco IP Holdings LLP 5757 N. Green Bay Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US | [2023/18] |
Former [2020/23] | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 2875 High Meadow Circle Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNOU, Damien Jean-Daniel 19 Rue du 11 Novembre 49280 La Séguinière / FR | 02 /
THIBAUD, Laurent Claude Eric 5 Rue des Marguerites 44330 Mouzillon / FR | 03 /
CLUNET, François Charles André 36 Rue des Ifs 44240 La Chapelle-Sur-Erdre / FR | 04 /
LE SAUSSE, Paul Eric 53 Rue Georges Guynemer 44300 Nantes / FR | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Nürnberg Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/23] | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18752400.4 | 24.07.2018 | [2020/23] | WO2018US43540 | Priority number, date | US201762536263P | 24.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762536263 P | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019023267 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3658829 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/00 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
F25B9/006 (EP);
F25B41/39 (EP);
F25B2700/04 (EP);
F25B2700/19 (EP);
F25B2700/2108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR MESSUNG EINER KÄLTEMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/23] | English: | REFRIGERANT COMPOSITION MEASUREMENT SYSTEM | [2020/23] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MESURE DE COMPOSITION DE FLUIDE FRIGORIGÈNE | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 13.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE4230818 (FRITZ EGGER GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-3,10,15,19 * column 7, line 67 - column 8, line 41; figure 1 * [I] 4-9,11-14,16-18,20; | [XAI]JPH1068555 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0006]; figure 5 * * paragraphs [0014] - [0021]; figures 1-4 * [A] 5,15-20 [I] 4,6-14; | [A]US6192696 (SHIMAMOTO DAISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* column 1, lines 4-28; figure 15 *; | [XAI]EP2924372 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0004] - [0005] - [ 0012] , [ 0035] - [0044]; figures 1, 5, 6 * [A] 5,15-20 [I] 4,6-14 |