EP3625693 - SENSOR BASED SEMANTIC OBJECT GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANTLAND, Tim c/o Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
BARNETT, Donald A. c/o Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
JONES, David Matthew c/o Google LLC 6 Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Seymour-Pierce, Alexandra Isobel, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18752910.2 | 12.07.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018US41854 | Priority number, date | US201715792393 | 24.10.2017 Original published format: US201715792393 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019083582 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3625693 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/00 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
G06F16/7837 (EP,US);
G06F40/30 (US);
G06F40/42 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06V20/20 (US);
G06V30/274 (US);
G06F18/214 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | SENSORBASIERTE SEMANTISCHE OBJEKTERZEUGUNG | [2020/13] | English: | SENSOR BASED SEMANTIC OBJECT GENERATION | [2020/13] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'OBJET SÉMANTIQUE BASÉE SUR UN CAPTEUR | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 20.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2021 | 16.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.06.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI] - Anonymous, "User Manual Indoor HD IP Camera Model: C1", (20161007), pages 1 - 80, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20161007102833/http://foscam.us/downloads/User%20Manual_C1.pdf, (20180904), XP055504188 [X] 1,2,6,10,12,13,17,21,22 * page 53 - page 56 * [Y] 3 [I] 11,16,20 | [Y] - Anonymous, "MEL Secure Systems | Periscope Camera", (20170328), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20170328165623/http://www.melsecuresystems.com/redeployable-cctv/110-periscope-camera, (20180904), XP055504202 [Y] 3 * page 1 - page 2 * |